EP1919432 - LIQUID DRUG TRANSFER DEVICES FOR FAILSAFE CORRECT SNAP FITTING ONTO MEDICINAL VIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medimop Medical Projects Ltd. 17 Hatidhar St. P.O. Box 2499 43665 Ra'anana / IL | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZINGER, Freddy 29 Kazan Street 43611 Ra'anana / IL | 02 /
DENENBURG, Igor 2 Raina Street 2107 Beberi, Riga District / LV | 03 /
GILBOA, Moshe 5A Bikat Sayarim Kfar Saba 44151 / IL | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06766219.7 | 08.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006IL00912 | Priority number, date | US20050707183P | 11.08.2005 Original published format: US 707183 P | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017868 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1919432 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1919432 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
A61J1/2089 (EP,US);
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2055 (EP,US);
A61J1/2065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | TRANSFERVORRICHTUNGEN FÜR FLÜSSIGE ARZNEIMITTEL ZUR AUSFALLSICHEREN KORREKTEN RASTVERBINDUNG AUF MEDIZINISCHEN AMPULLEN | [2008/20] | English: | LIQUID DRUG TRANSFER DEVICES FOR FAILSAFE CORRECT SNAP FITTING ONTO MEDICINAL VIALS | [2008/20] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE TRANSFERT DE MÉDICAMENT LIQUIDE POUR UN ENCLIQUETAGE CORRECT À SÛRETÉ INTÉGRÉE SUR DES FIOLES MÉDICINALES | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 10.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2006 | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0191693 (CARMEL PHARMA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 9 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003199847 (AKERLUND ROGER [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0054] ** figures 2-4 * |