EP1912628 - PHARMACEUTICAL SUSTAINED RELEASE COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panacea Biotec Ltd. B-1 Extn./A-27 Mohan Cooperative Industrial Estate Mathura Road New Delhi 110 044 / IN | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAIN, Rajesh Panacea Biotec Ltd. B-1 Extn./A-27,Mohan Co-op. Ind. Est.,Mathura Rd New Delhi 110 044 / IN | 02 /
JINDAL, Kour, Chand Panacea Biotec Ltd. B-1 Extn./A-27,Mohan Co-op. Ind. Est.,Mathura Rd New Delhi 110-044 / IN | 03 /
SINGH, Sukhjeet Panacea Biotec Ltd. B-1 Extn./A-27,Mohan Co-op. Ind. Est.,Mathura Rd New Delhi 110 044 / IN | 04 /
BOLDHANE, Sajay Panacea Biotec Ltd. B-1 Extn./A-27,Mohan Co-op. Ind. Est.,Mathura Rd New Delhi 110 044 / IN | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06766278.3 | 29.06.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006IN00225 | Priority number, date | INDE16802005 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: IN DE16802005 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007000779 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1912628 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2077 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | 25.01.2008 | BA | 25.01.2008 | HR | 25.01.2008 | MK | 25.01.2008 | RS | 25.01.2008 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/17] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL SUSTAINED RELEASE COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES THEREOF | [2008/17] | French: | NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES A LIBERATION PROLONGEE ET PROCEDES POUR LEUR PREPARATION | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/33] | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO02102415 (BLUE CROSS LAB LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,15-21 * page 14, line 6 - line 18 * * page 28; example 6 * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]US5556639 (FIELDEN KRYSTYNA E [GB]) [X] 1-5,8-11,14-21 * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 3 * * column 14, line 56 - column 15, line 15 * * column 15 - column 20; examples 1-31 * * column 21, line 1 - line 20 * [Y] 12,13; | [X]EP1281397 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN]) [X] 1-5,8-10,12,16-21 * page 11; example 5 *; | [X]EP1382331 (JAGOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11,15,17-21 * page 11 - page 12; example 3 *; | [X]US2003134864 (CAMPBELL KENNETH CHURCHILL [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15,17-20 * page 1, paragraph 21 - page 2 *; | [A]US2005112198 (CHALLAPALLI PRASAD V [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6-21 * page 10; example 1 * | Examination | WO2004016249 | WO9626717 |