EP1914298 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF BEER OR BEER-LIKE BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amano Enzyme Inc. 2-7, Nishiki 1-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-0003 / JP | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANO, Hitoshi@Gifu R&D Center, Amano EnzymeInc. 179-35, Sue-cho 4-chome, Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 5090108 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, S.@Gifu R&D Center, Amano Enzyme Inc. 179-35, Sue-cho 4-chome, Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 5090108 / JP | [2017/49] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
AMANO, Hitoshi Gifu R&D Center, Amano EnzymeInc. 179-35, Sue-cho 4-chome, Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 5090108 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAGUCHI, S. Gifu R&D Center, Amano Enzyme Inc. 179-35, Sue-cho 4-chome, Kakamigahara-shi Gifu 5090108 / JP | Representative(s) | Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke Patentanwälte PartG mbB Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 1140 52412 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Römerstraße 16 b 52428 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [2012/09] | Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 11 40 Römerstrasse 16 b 52412 Jülich / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 31 01 40 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte, Postfach 31 01 40 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06766452.4 | 05.06.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006JP311215 | Priority number, date | JP20050198238 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005198238 | [2008/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007487 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914298 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914298 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12C5/00, C12C7/04 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
C12C5/004 (EP,US);
C12C7/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | C12C7/00, C12C5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BIERÄHNLICHEN GETRÄNKS | [2008/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF BEER OR BEER-LIKE BEVERAGE | [2008/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BIÈRE OU DE BOISSON DE TYPE BIÈRE | [2008/17] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2008 | Translation filed | 22.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 31.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2006 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | IE | 05.06.2018 | LU | 05.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.06.2006 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 05.06.2006 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0232232 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 3 - line 21; claim - * * page 17, line 10 - line 17 * * page 30, line 11 - line 13 *; | [A]JPH10113162 (KIRIN BREWERY) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | US3795745 | US6036983 | US6465209 |