EP1777831 - RECEIVER APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Takeshi 19F Matsushita IMP Bld,3-7,Shiromi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
OZEKI, Hiroaki 19F Matsushita IMP Bld,3-7,Shiromi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
FUJII, Takeshi., Matsushita El.Ind.Co.Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bld,3-7,Shiromi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
OZEKI, Hiroaki., Matsushita El.Ind.Co.Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bld,3-7,Shiromi 1-chome,Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2007/17] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly CH-1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 06766480.5 | 08.06.2006 | [2007/17] | WO2006JP311505 | Priority number, date | JP20050219960 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005219960 | [2007/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007013226 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777831 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/28, H03J7/02, H03L7/193 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
H04B1/28 (EP,US);
H03L7/193 (EP,US);
H03J2200/02 (EP,US);
H03J2200/07 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0028 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0055 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | H04B1/26, H03J7/02, H03L7/183, H04J11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/17] | H04B1/26, H03L7/183, H03J7/02, H04J11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/45] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFÄNGERVORRICHTUNG UND DIESELBE VERWENDENDES ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2007/17] | English: | RECEIVER APPARATUS AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2007/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF RÉCEPTEUR ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2006 | Translation filed | 08.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 18.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5987074 (WAKAMATSU MASATAKA [JP]) [X] 1,5,7 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 33; figure 1 * * column 5, line 29 - line 48; figure 3 * [Y] 2-4,6; | [Y]US6720824 (HYAKUDAI TOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,6 * column 11, line 29 - line 60 * * column 13, line 1 - column 15, line 62; figure 9 *; | [Y]US5970105 (DACUS FARRON L [US]) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 69 - column 9, line 20; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2005147190 (NISHIKAWA TAKUROU [JP]) [Y] 6 * column 23, line 56 - line 62; figure 7 * |