EP1909001 - CONNECTION STRUCTURE BETWEEN INTEGRATED PANEL AND FLUID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD. 11-48, Nonakaminami 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0022 / JP | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSURA, Masayoshi Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo 6691333 / JP | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06766747.7 | 15.06.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006JP312013 | Priority number, date | JP20050202934 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005202934 | JP20050203940 | 13.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005203940 | [2008/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007508 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909001 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/10, F16L19/03 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
F16L39/00 (EP,US);
F16L19/02 (KR);
F16L19/0212 (EP,US);
F16L23/18 (EP,US);
F16L41/086 (EP,US);
F16L41/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/34] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR ZWISCHEN EINER INTEGRIERTEN PLATTE UND EINER FLUIDVORRICHTUNG | [2008/15] | English: | CONNECTION STRUCTURE BETWEEN INTEGRATED PANEL AND FLUID DEVICE | [2008/15] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CONNEXION ENTRE UN PANNEAU INTÉGRÉ ET UN DISPOSITIF FLUIDIQUE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2008 | Translation filed | 12.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 13.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |