EP1914330 - PROTECTIVE FILM STRUCTURE OF METAL MEMBER, METAL COMPONENT EMPLOYING PROTECTIVE FILM STRUCTURE, AND EQUIPMENT FOR PRODUCING SEMICONDUCTOR OR FLAT-PLATE DISPLAY EMPLOYING PROTECTIVE FILM STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | For all designated states Nihon Ceratec Co., Ltd. 5, Ake-dori 3-chome, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 981-3206 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nihon Ceratec Co., Ltd. 5, Ake-dori 3-chome, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 981-3206 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHMI, Tadahiro, c/o Tohoku University 1-1, Katahira 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 02 /
SHIRAI, Yasuyuki, c/o Tohoku University 1-1, Katahira 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 03 /
MORINAGA, Hitoshi, c/o Tohoku University 1-1, Katahira 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 04 /
KAWASE, Yasuhiro, c/o Tohoku University 1-1, Katahira 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 05 /
KITANO, Masafumi, c/o Tohoku University 1-1, Katahira 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 06 /
MIZUTANI, Fumikazu, MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CO. 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kiakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 07 /
ISHIKAWA, Makoto, MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CO. 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 08 /
KISHI, Yukio, c/o NIHON CERATEC CO., LTD. 5, Ake-Dori 3-chome, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-3206 / JP | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06766798.0 | 16.06.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006JP312110 | Priority number, date | JP20050178611 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005178611 | [2008/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006135043 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914330 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, C23C8/10, C25D11/08, C25D11/10, C25D11/16, C25D11/18, H01L21/205, H01L21/3065 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C23C4/02 (EP,US);
C23C28/00 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/042 (EP,US);
C23C8/10 (KR);
C23C8/80 (EP,US);
C25D11/02 (EP,US);
C25D11/08 (EP,US);
C25D11/10 (EP,US);
C25D11/16 (EP,KR,US);
C25D11/18 (EP,US);
C25D11/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IE [2008/21] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZFILMESTRUKTUR VON METALLELEMENT, METALLBAUTEIL MIT SCHUTZFILMSTRUKTUR UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBLEITERS ODER EINES FLACHDISPLAYS MIT SCHUTZFILMSTRUKTUR | [2008/17] | English: | PROTECTIVE FILM STRUCTURE OF METAL MEMBER, METAL COMPONENT EMPLOYING PROTECTIVE FILM STRUCTURE, AND EQUIPMENT FOR PRODUCING SEMICONDUCTOR OR FLAT-PLATE DISPLAY EMPLOYING PROTECTIVE FILM STRUCTURE | [2008/17] | French: | STRUCTURE DE FILM DE PROTECTION D ÉLÉMENT MÉTALLIQUE, COMPOSANT MÉTALLIQUE EMPLOYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE FILM DE PROTECTION, ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE FABRICATION DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR OU D'AFFICHAGE À ÉCRAN PLAT EMPLOYANT UNE STRUCTURE DE FILM DE PROTECTION | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2008 | Translation filed | 16.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 18.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6137959 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [X] 1,3,6,9 * page ABSTRACT *; | [X]EP0490914 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) [X] 1,3-6,9 * claims 1,12,20,21 *; | [X]WO9943869 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9* claims 1,6,11,12,15 *; | [X]EP1231299 (ISLE COAT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 18 - paragraph 19; claims 1,3,6 *; | [X]US6444304 (HISAMOTO JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 8 - line 15 * * column 9, line 14 * * column 10, line 12 - line 13 * * sentence 21 - sentence 23 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO03080892 (LAM RES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 10 * * page 9, line 29 * * page 12, paragraph 55 - page 13, paragraph 56 * * page 14, paragraph 60 - page 15, line 3 * * page 19, paragraph 70 *; | [X]US2004144319 (NAGAYAMA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1,3-6 * | Examination | US5919561 | JP2002180272 | US6776873 |