EP1905803 - MICROENCAPSULATED MATERIAL, MICROENCAPSULATED COLOR MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE MATERIAL, INK COMPOSITION, INK-JET RECORDING METHOD, AND RECORDED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYABAYASHI, Toshiyuki, c/o Seiko Epson Corp. 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | 02 /
YOKOYAMA, Masanobu, Mitsubishi Chemical Group 1000, Kamoshida-cho, Aoba-ku Yokohama, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
SAITOU, Takahiro, Mitsubishi Chemical Group 1000, Kamoshida-cho, Aoba-ku Yokohama, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Hideaki, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06766974.7 | 20.06.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006JP312313 | Priority number, date | JP20050179698 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005179698 | [2008/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006137393 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905803 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/10, B01J13/10, B01J13/14, B41J2/01, B41M5/00, C09D11/00 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
B01J13/14 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,US);
C09D7/45 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROVERKAPSELTES MATERIAL, MIKROVERKAPSELTES FARBMATERIAL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES MATERIALS, TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG, TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN UND MIT EINER AUFZEICHNUNG VERSEHENES MATERIAL | [2008/14] | English: | MICROENCAPSULATED MATERIAL, MICROENCAPSULATED COLOR MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE MATERIAL, INK COMPOSITION, INK-JET RECORDING METHOD, AND RECORDED MATERIAL | [2008/14] | French: | MATIÈRE MICROENCAPSULÉE, MATIÈRE COLORANTE MICROENCAPSULÉE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LA MATIÈRE, COMPOSITION D ENCRE, PROCÉDÉ D IMPRESSION À JET D ENCRE ET MATIÈRE IMPRIMÉE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | Translation filed | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |