EP1905344 - ENDOSCOPE AND ENDOSCOPE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONO, Kazuhiro c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06767186.7 | 22.06.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006JP312528 | Priority number, date | JP20050207509 | 15.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005207509 | [2008/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010709 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905344 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
A61B1/05 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00186 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0005 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/045 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0676 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0684 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0084 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/555 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP UND ENDOSKOPVORRICHTUNG | [2008/14] | English: | ENDOSCOPE AND ENDOSCOPE DEVICE | [2008/14] | French: | ENDOSCOPE ET DISPOSITIF ENDOSCOPE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2008 | Translation filed | 08.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 11.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4884133 (KANNO MASAHIDE [JP], et al); | [X]US4885634 (YABE HISAO [JP]); | [A]US4961110 (NAKAMURA KAZUNARI [JP]); | [X]EP1067376 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2002007122 (KAUFMAN HOWARD [US], et al); | [A]US2003001951 (TSUJITA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2003013937 (TSUJITA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) |