EP2031079 - HIGH-STRENGTH ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL SHEET AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Hidekuni NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION YAWATA WORKS 1-1, Tobihatacho Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8501 / JP | [2021/02] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Hidekuni NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION YAWATA WORKS 1-1, Tobihatacho Tobata-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/02] |
Former [2009/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06767202.2 | 16.06.2006 | [2009/10] | WO2006JP312552 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144964 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031079 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031079 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/46, C21D8/12, C22C38/00, C22C38/60, H01F1/147, H01F1/16 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/02 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/12 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/1216 (EP,US);
C21D8/1233 (EP,US);
C21D8/1244 (EP,US);
C21D8/1266 (EP,US);
C22C38/004 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | C21D9/46, C21D8/12, C22C38/00, C22C38/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2021/02] |
Former [2009/34] | DE, FR, GB, SE | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HOCHFESTE ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE STAHLPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/10] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH ELECTROMAGNETIC STEEL SHEET AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2009/10] | French: | TÔLE EN ACIER ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE DE RÉSISTANCE ÉLÉVÉÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/02] |
Former [2009/10] | TÔLE EN ACIER ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE À GRANDE RÉSISTANCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | Translation filed | 30.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 17.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 02.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.06.2021 | [2022/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | Examination | JPH09125148 |