EP1893414 - OPTICAL INFORMATION-RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Kousuke 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Tetsuya 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Keita 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06767549.6 | 22.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006JP312932 | Priority number, date | JP20050182439 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005182439 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006137580 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893414 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/26 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
C09B69/02 (EP,US);
B41M5/26 (KR);
C09B23/00 (KR);
G11B7/244 (KR);
G11B7/2478 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24612 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25706 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2571 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25713 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25715 (EP,US);
G11B2007/25718 (EP,US);
G11B7/245 (EP,US);
G11B7/2472 (EP,US);
G11B7/2531 (EP,US);
G11B7/2532 (EP,US);
G11B7/2533 (EP,US);
G11B7/2534 (EP,US);
G11B7/2535 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE INFORMATIONSAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG | [2008/10] | English: | OPTICAL INFORMATION-RECORDING MEDIUM | [2008/10] | French: | SUPPORT D ENREGISTREMENT D INFORMATIONS OPTIQUES | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 01.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |