EP1903067 - ALICYCLIC POLYESTER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASAI, Atsushi 1, Toho-cho, Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5108530 / JP | 02 /
NUKUI, Masahiro 1, Toho-cho, Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5108530 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Tomohiko 1, Toho-cho, Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5108530 / JP | 04 /
FUJIMURA, Atsushi 1, Toho-cho, Yokkaichi-shi Mie 5108530 / JP | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06767935.7 | 06.07.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006JP313476 | Priority number, date | JP20050203629 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005203629 | JP20050304321 | 19.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005304321 | [2008/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007631 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903067 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/199, C08G63/85, C08L67/02, C08L69/00 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
C08G63/199 (EP,US);
C08G63/85 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/49 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/18 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE [2008/35] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALICYCLISCHER POLYESTER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/13] | English: | ALICYCLIC POLYESTER, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND RESIN COMPOSITION | [2008/13] | French: | POLYESTER ALICYCLIQUE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, ET COMPOSITION DE RESINE | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2008 | Translation filed | 03.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 13.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |