EP2005715 - PORTABLE TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2009/49] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKA, Hideki c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Koji c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Yutaka c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 04 /
OYA, Akira c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 05 /
MASUDA, Hirokazu c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 06 /
YOON, John 2387, Terraza Guitara Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | 07 /
KRUGER, Kraig 5374, Desert Mountain Court Boulder Colorado 80301 / US | [2010/12] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
OKA, Hideki c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAMOTO, Koji c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
MAEDA, Yutaka c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
04 /
OYA, Akira c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
05 /
MASUDA, Hirokazu c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
06 /
YOON, John 2387, Terraza Guitara Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | |||
07 /
KRUGER, Kraig 5374, Desert Mountain Court Boulder Colorado 80301 / US | |||
Former [2008/52] | 01 /
OKA, Hideki Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAMOTO, Koji Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
MAEDA, Yutaka Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
04 /
OYA, Akira Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
05 /
MASUDA, Hirokazu Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
06 /
YOON, John 2387, Terraza Guitara Carlsbad, California 92009 / US | |||
07 /
KRUGER, Kraig 5374, Desert Mountain Court Boulder Colorado 80301 / US | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06768378.9 | 24.07.2006 | [2008/52] | WO2006JP315069 | Priority number, date | JP20060111265 | 13.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006111265 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007122747 | Date: | 01.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2005715 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2005715 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04B1/38 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
H04B1/3816 (EP,US);
G06K13/06 (US);
G06K13/08 (US);
G06K7/0021 (US);
H04B1/3883 (US);
H04M1/0202 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, NL [2009/19] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE ENDGERÄTEEINRICHTUNG | [2008/52] | English: | PORTABLE TERMINAL DEVICE | [2008/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL PORTABLE | [2008/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 14.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.03.2010 | [2010/45] |