EP1893920 - DEHUMIDIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Chi Wan 102-2301, Daedong Apt. Sangnam-dong, Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do, 641-777 / KR | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06768816.8 | 09.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006KR02215 | Priority number, date | KR20050050281 | 13.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050050281 | KR20050050280 | 13.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050050280 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006135169 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1893920 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/14, F24F5/00 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
B01D53/265 (EP,US);
F24F13/222 (EP,US);
F24F3/1423 (EP,US);
F24F2203/1012 (EP,US);
F24F2203/1032 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTFEUCHTER | [2008/10] | English: | DEHUMIDIFIER | [2008/10] | French: | DESHUMIDIFICATEUR | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 25.01.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2005265256 (TIGER VACUUM BOTTLE CO LTD); | [A]JP2002364903 (CORONA CORP) |