EP1913585 - APPARATUS AND METHOD OF PROCESSING AN AUDIO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEBCHEN, Tilman Lefevrestr. 17 D-12161 Berlin / DE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06769220.2 | 10.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006KR02683 | Priority number, date | US20050697551P | 11.07.2005 Original published format: US 697551 P | WO2005KR02290 | 16.07.2005 Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002290 | WO2005KR02291 | 16.07.2005 Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002291 | WO2005KR02292 | 16.07.2005 Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002292 | WO2005KR02306 | 18.07.2005 Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002306 | WO2005KR02307 | 18.07.2005 Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002307 | WO2005KR02308 | 18.07.2005 Original published format: PCT/KR2005/002308 | US20050700570P | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 700570 P | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007008005 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913585 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,US);
G10L19/0017 (EP,US);
G10L19/02 (EP,US);
G10L19/0212 (US);
G10L19/022 (EP,US);
G10L19/04 (EP,US);
G10L19/12 (US);
G10L19/167 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04S1/007 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (EP,US);
G10L19/005 (US);
G10L19/032 (US);
G10L19/06 (US);
G10L19/24 (US);
G11B2020/10546 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN EINES AUDIOSIGNALS | [2008/17] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD OF PROCESSING AN AUDIO SIGNAL | [2008/17] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR TRAITEMENT DU SIGNAL AUDIO | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 07.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 24.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - TILMAN LIEBCHEN, "Proposed Study on ISO/IEC 14496-3:2001/FPDAM 4, Audio Lossless Coding (ALS), new audio profiles and BSAC extensions", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20050429), no. M12018, XP030040726 [X] 1-13,16-28,31-35 * section X.6.2.1, section X.6.2.4, section X.6.2.6, section X.6.2.6.1, section X.6.2.6.2, section X.6.2.6.2.1, section X.6.2.6.2.2, section X.6.2.6.2.3, section X.6.2.6.2.4;;; tables X.8, X.17-X.20, X.25-X. 27, X. 29- X.32 * [I] 14,15,29,30 | [XI] - TILMAN LIEBCHEN, "Proposed Text of ISO/IEC 14496-3:2001/FPDAM 4, Audio Lossless Coding (ALS), new audio profiles and BSAC extensions", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20050112), no. M11658, XP030040403 [X] 1-13,16-28,31-35 * section X.6.2.1, section X.6.2.5, section X.6.2.6, section X.6.2.6.2.1, section X.6.2.6.1, section X.6.2.6.2, section X.6.2.6.2.1, section X.6.2.6.2.2, section X.6.2.6.2.3, section X.6.2.6.2.4;;; tables X.11, X.20- X.22, X.24-X.31 * [I] 14,15,29,30 | [A] - LIEBCHEN TILMAN ET AL, "Improved Forward-Adaptive Prediction for MPEG-4 Audio Lossless Coding", AES CONVENTION 118; MAY 2005, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20050501), XP040507257 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2003138157 (SCHWARTZ EDWARD L [US]); | [X]WO03085645 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A] - LIEBCHEN T., "An introduction to MPEG-4 audio lossless coding", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, (20040517), vol. 3, pages 1012 - 1015, XP010718364 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1326719 | Examination | - "Study on 14496-3:2001/FPDAM 4, ALS", ITU STUDY GROUP 16 - VIDEO CODING EXPERTS GROUP -ISO/IEC MPEG & ITU-T VCEG(ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG16 Q6), XX, XX, (20050506), no. N7134, XP030013792 |