EP1877513 - CAP LINERS, CLOSURES AND GASKETS FROM MULTI-BLOCK POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2012/18] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48647 / US | ||
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKOVICH, Ronald, Paul 2625 Sailboat Drive Houston, TX 77058 / US | 02 /
ELLEY-BRISTOW, Dale, M. 865 Tudor Close E Sarnia, Ontario N7V 2Z8 / CA | 03 /
PRIETO, Miguel, Alberto Bachtelstrasse 20 CH-8805 Richterswil / CH | 04 /
BARRY, Russell, Paul Frohberg 5 CH-Samstagern 8833 / CH | 05 /
MARTINEZ, Felipe 3206 Loblolly Pines Way Houston, Texas 77082 / US | 06 /
FALLA, Daniel, J. 2105 Blackwell Road Sarnia, Ontario N7T 7H4 / CA | 07 /
DAMEN, Julien, H., J., M. Leberenstrasse 8 CH-8932 Mettmenstetten / CH | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2019/19] |
Former [2008/03] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06769781.3 | 15.03.2006 | [2008/03] | WO2006US09501 | Priority number, date | WO2005US08917 | 17.03.2005 Original published format: PCT/US2005/008917 | US20050717824P | 16.09.2005 Original published format: US 717824 P | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006113000 | Date: | 26.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1877513 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1877513 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/10, B65D53/06, C08F297/08, C08F295/00, C08L23/04, C08L23/10, C08L53/00, C08L55/02 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
B65D53/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/14 (US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F295/00 (EP,US);
C08F297/04 (EP,US);
C08F297/08 (EP,US);
C08F297/083 (EP,US);
C08F297/086 (EP,US);
C08J9/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08L53/005 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F2410/01 (EP,US);
C08F4/659 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08J2323/16 (EP,US);
C08K3/26 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/0869 (EP,US);
C08L23/0876 (EP,US);
C09K2200/0617 (EP,US);
C09K2200/062 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/65904 (US,EP);
C08L23/04, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/04, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L53/005, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/005, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L53/005, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L53/005, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L53/025, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/09, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/20 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/08, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/09, C08F2500/20 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/11 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2008/03] | C09K3/10, B65D53/06, C08F297/08, C08F295/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVERKLEIDUNGEN, VERSCHLÜSSE UND DICHTUNGEN AUF MULTIBLOCK-POLYMEREN | [2008/03] | English: | CAP LINERS, CLOSURES AND GASKETS FROM MULTI-BLOCK POLYMERS | [2008/03] | French: | JOINTS DE CAPSULES, SYSTEMES DE FERMETURE ET JOINTS D'ETANCHEITE PRODUITS A PARTIR DE POLYMERES POLYSEQUENCES | [2008/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 29.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2006 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.03.2006 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 08.05.2019 | |
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9805731 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [X] 1-54 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1097976 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 24-35,51-53 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063]; example - * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] *; | [X]US2001039314 (MEHTA ASPY K [US], et al) [X] 24-35,51-53 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0185] * * paragraph [0189] * * paragraph [0193] * * example - * * paragraph [0216] *; | [X]US2003194575 (TAU LI-MIN [US], et al) [X] 24-35,51-53 * paragraph [0014]; figure 5 *; | [AX]EP1375585 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-23,54 * page 19; table 1 * * page 20; table 2 * * example - * * claim - * [X] 24-35,51-53; | [PX]US2005176892 (WEAVER LAURA B [US], et al) [PX] 1-23,54 * example - * * paragraph [0061] *; | [PX]WO2005090425 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-54 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005090426 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-54 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005090427 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-54* the whole document *; | [X] - TANEM B S ET AL, "Blends of single-site linear and branched polyethylene. I. Thermal characterisation", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (200106), vol. 42, no. 12, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 5389 - 5399, XP004231005 [X] 24-35,51-53 * table 1 * * Results and discussion * * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(00)00872-7 | [X] - NITTA K ET AL, "Polypropylene-block-poly(ethylene-co-propylene) addition to polypropylene/poly(ethylene-co-propylene) blends: morphology and mechanical properties", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (200008), vol. 41, no. 18, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 6765 - 6771, XP004203536 [X] 24-35,51-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(99)00895-2 | Examination | EP1858942 |