EP1879665 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANESTHETIC GAS RECLAMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anesthetic Gas Reclamation LLC 3102 West End Avenue Suite 700 Nashville, TN 37203 / US | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERRY, James, M. 3919 Estes Nashville, TN 37215 / US | 02 /
MORRIS, Steve 143 Timber Green Canton, Mississippi 39046 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06770274.6 | 11.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US18416 | Priority number, date | US20050680644P | 13.05.2005 Original published format: US 680644 P | US20050682249P | 18.05.2005 Original published format: US 682249 P | US20050266966 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: US 266966 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006124578 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1879665 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A62B7/04, A61M16/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
A61M16/009 (EP);
A61M16/01 (KR);
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M16/0093 (EP);
A62B7/00 (KR);
A62B7/04 (KR);
A61M2202/0208 (EP);
A61M2202/03 (EP);
A61M2205/3606 (EP);
A61M2205/84 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0208, A61M2202/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | A62B7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON ANÄSTHESIEGAS | [2008/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANESTHETIC GAS RECLAMATION | [2008/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECUPERATION DE GAZ ANESTHESIQUE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 21.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4945906 (LINDKVIST ERIK A [SE]) [Y] 5,11* column 5, line 8 - line 28; figures 2,3 *; | [XY]US6131571 (LAMPOTANG SAMSUN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 7, line 3 - column 8, line 41 * * column 12, line 64 - column 15, line 35; figures 1-2, 5 * [Y] 5,11 | International search | [X]US5769072 (OLSSON SVEN-GUNNAR [SE], et al); | [Y]USRE36460E (KLATZ RONALD M [US], et al) | by applicant | US6131571 | US4945906 |