EP1889497 - ADVANCED TRIGGERS FOR LOCATION-BASED SERVICE APPLICATIONS IN A WIRELESS LOCATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TruePosition, Inc. 1000 Chesterbrook Boulevard , Suite 200 Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULL, Jeffrey, F. 100 Aspen Court Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | 02 /
CZARNECKI, Paul, Matthew 2505 S.W. 32nd. Street Cape Coral, Florida 33914 / US | 03 /
GINTER, Thomas, Stephan 110 Cheryl Drive Downington, PA 19335 / US | 04 /
WARD, Matthew, L. 363 Woodlyn Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 05 /
ANDERSON, Robert, J. 50 Guilford Circle Phoenixville, PA 19460-2663 / US | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
BULL, Jeffrey, F. 100 Aspen Court Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | ||
02 /
CZARNECKI, Paul, Matthew 2339 Mayflower Drive SW Palm City, FL 34990 / US | |||
03 /
GINTER, Thomas, Stephan 110 Cheryl Drive Downington, PA 19335 / US | |||
04 /
WARD, Matthew, L. 363 Woodlyn Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
05 /
ANDERSON, Robert, J. 50 Guilford Circle Phoenixville, PA 19460-2663 / US | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06770916.2 | 22.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US19863 | Priority number, date | US20050150414 | 10.06.2005 Original published format: US 150414 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006135542 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1889497 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1889497 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
H04W4/025 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,GB,US);
G01S5/0205 (EP,GB,KR,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/90 (EP,KR,US);
H04W60/04 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORTGESCHRITTENE AUSLÖSER FÜR POSITIONSBASIERTE DIENSTANWENDUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN POSITIONSSYSTEM | [2008/08] | English: | ADVANCED TRIGGERS FOR LOCATION-BASED SERVICE APPLICATIONS IN A WIRELESS LOCATION SYSTEM | [2008/08] | French: | BASCULES DE POINTE POUR APPLICATIONS DE SERVICES A SITE FIXE DANS UN SYSTEME DE LOCALISATION SANS FIL | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09175589.2 Application withdrawn : 18.02.2010 | EP10153860.1 / EP2207392 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 24.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | BE | 25.08.2010 | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | LT | 25.08.2010 | LV | 25.08.2010 | PL | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | LU | 22.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
TR | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
LU | 22.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
LU | 22.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
LT | 25.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0156308 (INVERTIX CORP [US]); | [DY]US2002039904 (ANDERSON ROBERT J [US]) | International search | [A]US5602903 (LEBLANC FREDERICK W [US], et al); | [A]US6236365 (LEBLANC FREDERICK W [US], et al); | [A]US6321090 (SOLIMAN SAMIR S [US]); | [Y]WO0191399 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [Y]WO03071303 (TELIA AB [SE], et al); | [X]WO2004034721 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) | by applicant | WO0156308 | US2002039904 | US6782264 |