EP1897401 - DISCOVERY OF AN ADJACENT NETWORK ELEMENT WITHIN A NETWORK DATA PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infinera Corporation 1322 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2008/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Biao 19608 Pruneridge Avenue, 8207 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
MISRA, Mohit Infinera India (p) Ltd. Prestige Solitaire 401 Level 4 6 Brunton Road Bangalore 560001 / IN | 03 /
JAIN, Maneesh Infinera India (p) Ltd. Prestige Solitaire 401 Level 4 6 Brunton Road Bangalore 560001 / IN | 04 /
RAMAMURTHY, Shankara 9/24, 11th Avenue Ashok Nagar Chennai 600083 / IN | [2012/42] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
LU, Biao 19608 Pruneridge Avenue, 8207 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | ||
02 /
MISRA, Mohit Infinera India (p) Ltd. Prestige Solitaire 401, Level 4, 6 Brunton Road Bangalore 560001 / IN | |||
03 /
JAIN, Maneesh Infinera India (p) Ltd. Prestige Solitaire 401, Level 4, 6 Brunton Road Bangalore 560001 / IN | |||
04 /
RAMAMURTHY, Shankara 9/24, 11th Avenue, Ashok Nagar Chennai 600083 / IN | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06770984.0 | 23.05.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006US19964 | Priority number, date | US20050695392P | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 695392 P | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007005142 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1897401 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1897401 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/0241 (EP,US);
H04L45/62 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0062 (EP,US);
H04J14/0279 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0071 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0088 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/31] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ENTDECKUNG EINES BENACHBARTEN NETZWERKELEMENTS IN EINER NETZWERK-DATENEBENE | [2008/11] | English: | DISCOVERY OF AN ADJACENT NETWORK ELEMENT WITHIN A NETWORK DATA PLANE | [2008/11] | French: | DECOUVERTE D'UN ELEMENT DE RESEAU ADJACENT DANS UN PLAN DE DONNEES DE RESEAU | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 31.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.03.2013 | [2014/11] | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1335627 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION) [X] 1,2,11,17 * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] - [0031] , [0032] , [0044] , [0045] * [A] 3-10,12-16,18-21; | [A]US2003169684 (YAMANAKA NAOAKI ET AL) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008]; claim 135 * | [A] - AYAN BANERJEE ET AL, "Generalized Multiprotocol Label Switching: An Overview of Signaling Enhancements and Recovery Techniques", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (200107), vol. 39, no. 7, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 144 - 151, XP011091771 [A] 1-21 * page 145, column R, line 38 - page 146, column R, line 18; figure 1 * * page 148, column L, line 10 - column R, line 3 * |