EP1889000 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING AN INTERACTION BETWEEN A LASER SHAPED AS A LINE BEAM AND A FILM DEPOSITED ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127-2413 / US | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH 73446 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127-2413 / US | ||
For all designated states Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH 73446 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAS, Palash, P. 2029 Paseo de Anza Vista, CA 92084 / US | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Thomas 4794 Arizona Street, suite 205 San Diego, CA 92116 / US | 03 /
SANDSTROM, Richard, L. 410 Bridoon Terrace Encintas, CA 92024 / US | 04 /
BOUCKY, Otto Scheidemannstr. 104 Heidenheim / DE | 05 /
STUMPP, Ernst Forstweg 3 89551 Koenigsbronn / DE | 06 /
MATZKOVITS, Berthold Rosensteinweg 8 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 07 /
HOELL, Michael Ruland-aysslinger-weg 11 73430 Aalen / DE | 08 /
WALTHER, Joerg A-laemmle-str. 9 89547 Gerstetten / DE | 09 /
BRENNER, Kurt Am Eichelberg 5 74589 Satteldorf / DE | 10 /
GRUPP, Guenter Friedhofstr. 32 89558 Boehmenkirch / DE | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Straße 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl Zeiss AG c/o Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Straße 22 D-73447 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06771153.1 | 25.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US20215 | Priority number, date | US20050138175 | 26.05.2005 Original published format: US 138175 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006127886 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1889000 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/14, G03F9/00 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
B23K26/03 (EP,US);
G01B11/00 (KR);
B23K26/0006 (EP,US);
B23K26/032 (EP,US);
B23K26/04 (EP,US);
B23K26/043 (EP,US);
B23K26/0622 (EP,US);
B23K26/0665 (EP,US);
B23K26/0738 (EP,US);
B23K26/083 (EP,US);
B23K26/352 (EP,US);
B23K37/0408 (EP,US);
B23K37/047 (EP,US);
C30B13/22 (EP,US);
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
G01B21/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/70383 (EP,US);
G03F7/70583 (EP,US);
B23K2101/18 (EP,US);
B23K2101/38 (EP,US);
B23K2103/56 (EP,US);
H01L27/1296 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | G01B11/14 | ||
Former IPC [2008/08] | G01B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM IMPLEMENTIEREN UND WECHSELWIRKEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ALS LINIENSTRAHL GEFORMTEN LASER UND EINEM AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT ABGELAGERTEN FILM | [2008/08] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING AN INTERACTION BETWEEN A LASER SHAPED AS A LINE BEAM AND A FILM DEPOSITED ON A SUBSTRATE | [2008/08] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR L'INTERACTION ENTRE UN LASER EN FORME DE FAISCEAU EN LIGNE ET UN FILM DEPOSE SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 12.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/24] | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US2005259709 (DAS PALASH P [US], et al) [XP] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US5473424 (OKUMURA MASAHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8-11,13,16 * column 1, lines 6-13 * * column 9, lines 25-67 * * column 12, line 9 - column 14, line 3; figures 1,4-7 *; | [XY]US6861614 (TANABE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,9,16 * column 23, line 25 - column 26, line 52; figure 23 * [Y] 2,3,10,11; | [Y]US6122036 (YAMASAKI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,10,11 * column 15, line 62 - column 16, line 19; figure 4 *; | [X]US5443932 (OHTA HIROHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 64 * * column 5, lines 18-35; figures 1a,2a-2c,4 * | International search | [A]US6400445 (NISHI KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2003142313 (KATAYAMA SHOSHI [JP]); | [A]US2002104231 (TOMINAGA TAMOTSU [JP], et al) |