EP1887977 - Devices for operating and controlling interventional apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/08] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR OPERATING AND CONTROLLING INTERVENTIONAL APPARATUS | ||
[2012/47] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Opposition rejected | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.W. Medical Systems Ltd. 328 Shichang Avenue Weihai Shandong 264209 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states J.W. Medical Systems Ltd. 328 Shichang Avenue Weihai Shandong 264209 / CN | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Xtent, Inc. 125 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, Stephen, Lee 1291 Portland Avenue Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 02 /
MCGARRY, Michael C. 10208 Red Fir Road Trunckee, California 96161 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Leoni, Richard Pietro, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | Wilkinson, Marc George, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/30] | Broughton, Jon Philip HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06771362.8 | 26.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US20553 | Priority number, date | US20050148713 | 08.06.2005 Original published format: US 148713 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006135551 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1887977 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887977 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/966 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61F2/966 (EP,US);
A61M25/0136 (EP,US);
A61F2002/826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/04] | A61F2/84 | ||
Former IPC [2008/08] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen für den Betrieb und die Steuerung eines interventionellen Geräts | [2012/47] | English: | Devices for operating and controlling interventional apparatus | [2012/47] | French: | Dispositifs d'utilisation et de commande d'un appareil d'intervention | [2012/47] |
Former [2008/08] | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN BETRIEB UND DIE STEUERUNG EINES INTERVENTIONELLEN GERÄTS | ||
Former [2008/08] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR OPERATING AND CONTROLLING INTERVENTIONAL APPARATUS | ||
Former [2008/08] | DISPOSITIFS ET METHODES D'UTILISATION ET DE COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL D'INTERVENTION | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2013
13.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation One Boston Scientific Place Natick, Massachusetts 01760-1537 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2013
13.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation One Boston Scientific Place Natick, Massachusetts 01760-1537 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins Schley, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Soeltlstraße 2a 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2013
13.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation One Boston Scientific Place Natick, Massachusetts 01760-1537 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins, Frank, et al, et al Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Söltlstraße 2a 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2013
13.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Corporation One Boston Scientific Place Natick, Massachusetts 01760-1537 / US Opponent's representative Peterreins, Frank, et al, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | 25.02.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.09.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.07.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/01] | 07.07.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.08.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.08.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2006 | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | IE | 26.05.2013 | LU | 26.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 26.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 26.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0990426 (MEDTRONIC AVE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6669716 (GILSON PAUL [IE], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US2005049667 (ARBEFEUILLE SAMUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0175] - [0189]; figures 33,51 *; | [X]US2005080476 (GUNDERSON RICHARD C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraphs [0052] , [0061] , [0062]; figures 6A-6C,15-17 * | International search | [A]US4713049 (CARTER GARRY L [US]); | [Y]US5246421 (SAAB MARK A [US]); | [Y]US6319227 (MANSOURI-RUIZ IDRISS [US]); | [A]US6884257 (COX DANIEL L [US]) | by applicant | US5246421 | US6319227 | US2005049667 | US2005080476 | US20030624451 | US20030637713 | US20030746466 |