EP1888162 - SYSTEM FOR MODULATING OSTEOCHONDRAL DEVELOPMENT USING PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/08] | METHODS FOR MODULATING OSTEOCHONDRAL DEVELOPMENT USING PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD THERAPY | ||
[2014/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medrelief Inc. 4800 Montgomery Lane Suite 801 Bethesda, Maryland 20814 / US | [2015/23] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Healthonics, Inc 3106 Vinings Ridge Drive Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRONBERG, James, W. 108 Independent Boulevard Aiken, SC 29803 / US | 02 /
GANEY, Timothy 6104 River Terrace Tampa, FL 33604 / US | 03 /
GORDON, Stephen, L. 505 Garden View Way Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Moore, Barry Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Moore, Barry Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06771526.8 | 30.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US20819 | Priority number, date | US20050687430P | 03.06.2005 Original published format: US 687430 P | US20050693490P | 23.06.2005 Original published format: US 693490 P | US20060790128P | 07.04.2006 Original published format: US 790128 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006132855 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1888162 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1888162 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32, A61N1/40 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
A61N1/326 (EP);
A61N1/00 (KR);
A61N1/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | A61N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MODULIERUNG DER OSTEOCHONDRALEN ENTWICKLUNG MIT ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER PULS-FELD-THERAPIE | [2014/51] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MODULATING OSTEOCHONDRAL DEVELOPMENT USING PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD THERAPY | [2014/51] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINEE A LA MODULATION DU DEVELOPPEMENT OSTEO-CARTILAGINEUX, DANS LESQUELLES EST UTILISEE UNE THERAPIE PAR CHAMP ELECTROMAGNETIQUE PULSE | [2014/51] |
Former [2008/08] | VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG DER OSTEOCHONDRALEN ENTWICKLUNG MIT ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER PULS-FELD-THERAPIE | ||
Former [2008/08] | METHODS FOR MODULATING OSTEOCHONDRAL DEVELOPMENT USING PULSED ELECTROMAGNETIC FIELD THERAPY | ||
Former [2008/08] | METHODES DESTINEES A LA MODULATION DU DEVELOPPEMENT OSTEO-CARTILAGINEUX, DANS LESQUELLES EST UTILISEE UNE THERAPIE PAR CHAMP ELECTROMAGNETIQUE PULSE | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2008 | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.2009 | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2011 | 31.05.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2012 | 31.05.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | RO | 08.07.2015 | [2017/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5312439 (LOEB GERALD E [CA]) [Y] 30 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 14 *; | [X]US5413596 (KRONBERG JAMES W [US]) [X] 23,27-30 * column 1, lines 49-60 ** column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 11; figure 1 *; | [XY]US6535767 (KRONBERG JAMES W [US]) [X] 23-29 * the whole document * [Y] 30 | International search | [Y]US2004210282 (FLOCK STEPHEN T [US], et al); | [X]US2004267333 (KRONBERG JAMES W [US]); | [Y]US2005049640 (GURTNER GEOFFREY C [US], et al); | [Y]US2005084962 (SIMON BRUCE [US]) |