EP1907749 - INSULATED PIPE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cabot Corporation 2 Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston MA 02210-2019 / US | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINON, John, L. 236 Mount Vernon Street Lawrence, MA 01843 / US | 02 /
KALKSTEIN, Hobart, C. 315 Cross Street Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | 03 /
MAITY, Nirmalya 7 Jay Lane Acton, MA 01720 / US | 04 /
PAINTAL, Ravijit 15 Idylwilde Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 05 /
JOHNSON, Aaron, H. 274 Marrett Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 06 /
DU PLESSIS, Andries 48 Winter Street Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06772244.7 | 06.06.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US21864 | Priority number, date | US20050687672P | 06.06.2005 Original published format: US 687672 P | US20060337050 | 21.01.2006 Original published format: US 337050 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006133155 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1907749 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907749 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/153, F16L59/14 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
F16L59/143 (EP,US);
F16L59/14 (KR);
C04B30/00 (EP,US);
C04B38/08 (EP,US);
F16L59/00 (KR);
F16L59/028 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B30/00, C04B14/064 (EP,US);
C04B38/08, C04B14/06, C04B30/00, C04B38/0054 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/15] | F16L59/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | ISOLIERTES ROHR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/15] | English: | INSULATED PIPE AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2008/15] | French: | TUYAU ISOLE ET SON PROCEDE DE CONCEPTION | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08010622.2 / EP1975498 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2006 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.06.2006 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US4581804 (MCLAUGHLIN HUGH T [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11,16,17,21-32,34,36-40,42-44 * column 2,, lines 40-50 - column 3, lines 18-21; figures 1,3 * [A] 9,18-20,35,41 [Y] 7,12-15,33; | [AY]US6132837 (BOES R ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-44 * abstract * [Y] 7,12-15,33; | [AY]WO03056230 (CABOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-44 * abstract *[Y] 7,12-15,33 |