EP1900231 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION USING A WIRELESS HANDSET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNCATION USING A WIRELESS HANDSET | ||
[2017/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCLUNG, Michael, H. 1812 Frays Mill Road Ruckersville, VA 22968-1601 / US | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/12] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06772294.2 | 06.06.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006US21924 | Priority number, date | US20050173032 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: US 173032 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007005179 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900231 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900231 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W60/00, H04M3/42, // H04M3/56, H04W8/26, H04W36/14, H04W80/10, H04W88/02 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H04M3/42263 (EP,US);
H04W60/005 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2094 (EP,US);
H04M2207/203 (EP,US);
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04W36/14 (US);
H04W36/142 (EP);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W80/10 (EP,US);
H04W88/021 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | H04W60/00, H04M3/42 | ||
Former IPC [2008/12] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT EINEM DRAHTLOSEN HANDAPPARAT | [2008/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION USING A WIRELESS HANDSET | [2017/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION AVEC D'UN DISPOSITIF PORTABLE SANS FIL | [2017/27] |
Former [2008/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNCATION USING A WIRELESS HANDSET | ||
Former [2008/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNCATION USING A WIRELESS HANDSET | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2006 | AT | 15.11.2017 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | ES | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | IE | 06.06.2018 | LU | 06.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 06.06.2006 | |
AT | 15.11.2017 | ||
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 06.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 06.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 06.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 06.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 06.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
LU | 06.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.11.2017 | |
ES | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 15.11.2017 | |
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1122966 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,11-14,17,21-23,26,31-33,36,40-42 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] - [0009] - [0013] , [0014] * [Y] 5,7,10,16,18,25,27,30,35,37 [I] 4,8,9,15,19,20,24,28,29,34,38,39; | [XA]US2002193107 (NASCIMENTO OSWALDO L DO [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,11-15,17,19-24,26,28,29,31-34,36,38-42 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0030] , [0033] , [0034] , [0037] , [0041] , [0042] , [0055] , [0072] - [0075] - [0079] , [0081] , [0087] - [0090] - [0094] , [0097] * * paragraphs [0100] - [0105] - [0112] - [0119] - [0124] * [A] 5,7,10,16,18,25,27,30,35,37; | [A]US2003108002 (CHANEY ADAM [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0040] - [0042] *; | [YA]US2004202303 (COSTA-REQUENA JOSE [FI], et al) [Y] 5,7,16,18,25,27,35,37 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] * [A] 1-4,6,8-15,17,19-24,26,28-34,36,38-42; | [YA]US2005020241 (HOLLAND BRYAN [US], et al) [Y] 10,30 * paragraphs [0030] , [0038] , [0080] - [0082] - [0090]; figures 5,7 *[A] 1-9,11-29,31-42 | International search | [A]US6400964 (ZICKER ROBERT G [US], et al); | [X]US2002193107 (NASCIMENTO OSWALDO L DO [US]); | [Y]US2003108002 (CHANEY ADAM [US], et al); | [A]US2003134630 (SCHEINERT STEFAN [US], et al); | [A]US2003188319 (WEISSMAN HAIM [IL]); | [Y]US2004202303 (COSTA-REQUENA JOSE [FI], et al); | [Y]US2005020241 (HOLLAND BRYAN [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1122966 |