EP1891016 - SYNTHESIS OF 3-AMINO-4-SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONG, Jianshe 15 Cobblers Circle Franklin Park, New Jersey 08823 / US | 02 /
MENG, Tao 468 West End Avenue, Apt. 4c North Plainfield, New Jersey 07060 / US | 03 /
LIANG, Xian 31 Lexington Road Monmouth Junction, New Jersey 08852 / US | 04 /
WONG, Jesse, K. 2 Hampshire Place Monroe Township, New Jersey 08831 / US | 05 /
MC NAMARA, Paul 1261 Christine Circle Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06772474.0 | 07.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006US22190 | Priority number, date | US20050688995P | 09.06.2005 Original published format: US 688995 P | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006133322 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1891016 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/38 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C07D231/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | RS | 23.11.2007 | Title | German: | SYNTHESE AUS 3-AMINO-4-SUBSTITUIERTEN PYRAZOLDERIVATEN | [2008/09] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF 3-AMINO-4-SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLE DERIVATIVES | [2008/09] | French: | SYNTHESE DE DERIVES DE PYRAZOLE SUBSTITUES PAR 3-AMINO-4 | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US2004209878 (GUZI TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [DY] 1-25 * Page 59, Scheme 1, Prep. Ex. 3 (according to the procedure of prep. ex. 1) *; | [Y] - OJIKA M. ET AL, "Structure and Synthesis of Reductiline...", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1982), vol. 23, no. 47, pages 4977 - 4980, XP002413168 [Y] 1-25 * page 4979, paragraph 3; compound 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)85765-2 | by applicant | US2004209878 | - OKAZAKI ET AL., CHEM. PHARM BULL, (1998), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 69 - 78 |