EP1910568 - MULTIPLEXED POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION FOR GENETIC SEQUENCE ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE NAVY Naval Research Laboratory 4555 Overlook Avenue, S.W. Code 1008.2 Washington, DC 20375 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Baochuan 5905 Rudyard Dr Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
BLANEY, Kate, M. 1227 N. Van Dorn St Alexandria, VA 22304 / US | 03 /
MALANOSKI, Anthony, P. 5995 Springhill Dr., Apt. 202 Greenbelt, MD 20770 / US | 04 /
SCHNUR, Joel, M. 6009 Lincolnwood Ct. Burke, VA 22015 / US | 05 /
STENGER, David, A. 2520 Brofferton Ct Herndon, VA 20171 / US | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
LIN, Baochuan 5905 Rudyard Dr Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | ||
02 /
BLANEY, Kate, M. 1227 N. Van Dorn St Alexandria, VA 22304 / US | |||
03 /
MALANOSKI, Anthony, P. 5995 Springhill Dr., Apt. 202 Greenbelt, MD 20770 / US | |||
04 /
SCHNUR, Joel, M. 6009 Lincolnwood Ct. Burke, VA 22015 / US | |||
05 /
STENGER, David, A. 252 Brofferton Ct Herndon, VA 20171 / US | |||
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
Lin, Baochuan 5905 Rudyard Dr Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | ||
02 /
Blaney, Kate, M. 1227 N. Van Dorn St Alexandria, VA 22304 / US | |||
03 /
Malanoski, Anthony, P. 5995 Springhill Dr., Apt. 202 Greenbelt, MD 20770 / US | |||
04 /
Schnur, Joel, M. 6009 Lincolnwood Ct. Burke, VA 22015 / US | |||
05 /
Stenger, David, A. 252 Brofferton Ct Herndon, VA 20171 / US | |||
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
LIN, Baochuan 5905 Rudyard Dr Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | ||
02 /
BLANEY, Kate, M. 1227 N. Van Dorn St Alexandria, VA 22304 / US | |||
03 /
MALANOSKI, Anthony, P. 5995 Springhill Dr., Apt. 202 Greenbelt, MD 20770 / US | |||
04 /
SCHNUR, Joel, M. 6009 Lincolnwood Ct. Burke, VA 22015 / US | |||
05 /
STENGER, David, A. 252 Brofferton Ct Herndon, VA 20171 / US | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Schumacher, Horst, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstraße 43 A D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06772796.6 | 09.06.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US22623 | Priority number, date | US20050691768P | 16.06.2005 Original published format: US 691768 P | US20050177647 | 02.07.2005 Original published format: US 177647 | US20050177646 | 02.07.2005 Original published format: US 177646 | US20050268373 | 07.11.2005 Original published format: US 268373 | US20050735876P | 14.11.2005 Original published format: US 735876 P | US20050735824P | 14.11.2005 Original published format: US 735824 P | US20060743639P | 22.03.2006 Original published format: US 743639 P | US20060422425 | 06.06.2006 Original published format: US 422425 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006138183 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1910568 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPLEX-POLYMERASEKETTENREAKTION ZUR GENTECHNISCHEN SEQUENZANALYSE | [2008/17] | English: | MULTIPLEXED POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION FOR GENETIC SEQUENCE ANALYSIS | [2008/16] | French: | REACTION EN CHAINE DE LA POLYMERASE MULTIPLEXEE POUR L'ANALYSE DE SEQUENCE GENETIQUE | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/16] | MULTIPLEX-POLYMERASEKETTENREAKTION ZUR GENTECHNISCHENSEQUENZANALYSE | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 24.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9742345 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8,12,15 * claims 1,8,15,16 * * page 1, line 4 - line 14 * * page 3, line 26 - line 27 * * page 4, line 8 - line 24 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 2 * [I] 3,4,11,13,14,16-22; | [Y]EP1327691 (DR CHIP BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [TW]) [Y] 1-22 * claims 9-12 * * example 3 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0015] , [0018] , [0025] , [0035] *; | [Y]WO2004044240 (NOVEMBER AG MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 8 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 9 * * page 16, line 14 - line 33 * * page 18, line 25 - line 28; claims 1,2,10 *; | [Y]CA2418004 (BOIVIN GUY [CA]) [Y] 1-22 * example 5 * * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph l - page 11 ** claims 1-6 *; | [XI]WO2004099439 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,12 * claims 1,21 * * page 11, line 28 - line 29 * * page 9, line 9 - line 10 * * page 7, line 11 - line 15 * * example 1 * [I] 3,4,7,8,11,13-22; | [Y] - WANG D ET AL, "MICROARRAY-BASED DETECTION AND GENOTYPING OF VIRAL PATHOGENS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA. (PNAS), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1073/PNAS.242579699, (20021126), vol. 99, no. 24, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 15687 - 15692, XP001179784 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * page 15688, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 15690, column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.242579699 | [YD] - SHUBER A P ET AL, "A SIMPLIFIED PROCEDURE FOR DEVELOPING MULTIPLEX PCRS", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (19951201), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 488 - 493, XP000546034 [YD] 1-22 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5853989 (JEFFREYS ALEC JOHN [GB], et al); | [Y]US5958686 (HOUNG HUO-SHU H [US]); | [Y]US2003082618 (LI GUANGSHAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6287776 (HEFTI JOHN [US]); | [Y]US6843997 (GROSE CHARLES F [US], et al); | [Y]US5837832 (CHEE MARK [US], et al) | [Y] - WILSON W.J. ET AL., "Sequence-specific identification of 18 pathogenic microorganisms using microarray technology", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, (2002), vol. 16, pages 119 - 127, XP001152529 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.2001.0397 | Examination | - INAGAKI S ET AL, "A new 39-plex analysis method for SNPs including 15 blood group loci", FORENSIC SCIENCE INTERNATIONAL, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS IRELAND LTD, IE, (20040507), vol. 144, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.FORSCIINT.2004.03.005, ISSN 0379-0738, pages 45 - 57, XP002408098 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.forsciint.2004.03.005 |