EP1907470 - IONIC LIQUID RECONSTITUTED CELLULOSE COMPOSITES AS SOLID SUPPORT MATRICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Alabama 222 Rose Administration Building Post Office Box 870106 Tuscaloosa, AL 35487-0106 / US | [2013/15] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states The University of Alabama 222 Rose Administration Building Post Office Box 870106 Tuscaloosa, AL 35487-0106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, Robin, D. 32 Audubon Place Tuscaloosa, AL 35401 / US | 02 /
DALY, Daniel, T. 1518 Mallard Circle Tuscaloosa, AL 25405 / US | 03 /
TURNER, Megan, B. 1908 Inverness Parkway Tuscaloosa, AL 35405 / US | 04 /
SPEAR, Scott, K. 302 Country Road 49 Bakston, AL 35542 / US | 05 /
HOLBREY, John, D. 1925 Eighth Avenue, Apt. 2b Tuscaloosa, AL 35401 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Jewell, Catherine Mary, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2012/50] |
Former [2008/33] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/15] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06774039.9 | 27.06.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US24863 | Priority number, date | US20050694902P | 29.06.2005 Original published format: US 694902 P | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007005388 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1907470 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907470 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L1/00, C09D189/00, C09D101/00 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
C08L1/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L79/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L89/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D189/00 (KR);
C08L2666/14 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L1/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L1/02, C08L2666/20 (EP,US);
C08L1/02, C08L2666/26 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | MIT IONISCHER FLÜSSIGKEIT REKONSTITUIERTE CELLULOSEVERBUNDWERKSTOFFE ALS FESTE TRÄGERMATRIZES | [2008/15] | English: | IONIC LIQUID RECONSTITUTED CELLULOSE COMPOSITES AS SOLID SUPPORT MATRICES | [2008/15] | French: | COMPOSITES COMPRENANT DE LA CELLULOSE RECONSTITUEE PAR UN LIQUIDE IONIQUE SERVANT DE MATRICES DE SUPPORT SOLIDES | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 06.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2006 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | IT | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | IE | 27.06.2013 | LU | 27.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | ES | 21.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
IE | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
IT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - TURNER M B ET AL, "Ionic Liquid-Reconstituted Cellulose Composites as Solid Support Matrices for Biocatalyst Immobilization", BIOMACROMOLECULES, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, vol. 6, doi:10.1021/BM050199D, ISSN 1525-7797, (20050729), pages 2497 - 2502, (20050729), XP002478762 [XP] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm050199d | [XY] - OKUTUCU BURCU ET AL, "Covalent attachment of oligonucleotides to cellulose acetate membranes", ARTIFICIAL CELLS BLOOD SUBSTITUTES AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 599 - 608, XP009149401 [X] 1,3-14,20,21,37,38 * the whole document * [Y] 1-41 | [Y] - DANIELA STÖLLNER ET AL, "Activation of Cellulose Membranes with 1,1'-Carbonyldiimidazole or 1-Cyano-4-dimethylaminopyridinium tetrafluoroborate as a Basis for the Development of Immunosensors", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20020501), vol. 304, no. 2, doi:10.1006/abio.2001.5603, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 157 - 165, XP055000743 [Y] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2001.5603 | International search | [X]US5747125 (MARKULIN JOHN [US]); | [X]US6808557 (HOLBREY JOHN DAVID [US], et al) |