EP1906761 - FLAVORED FRUIT SEGMENTS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applesweets LLC 123 Ohme Garden Road Wenatchee, WA 98801 / US | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIGHT, Matthew, O. 3080 Conarty Road Malaga, Washington 98828 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Michael, J. 1116 Telford Street Se East Wenatchee, Washington 98802 / US | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Schuster, Thomas Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06774207.2 | 27.06.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006US25205 | Priority number, date | US20050694595P | 27.06.2005 Original published format: US 694595 P | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007002768 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906761 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/212, A23B7/00, A23B7/022 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
A23B7/154 (EP,US);
A23L19/03 (EP,US);
A23L27/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AROMATISIERTE FRUCHTSEGMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/15] | English: | FLAVORED FRUIT SEGMENTS AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2008/15] | French: | SEGMENTS DE FRUITS AROMATISES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANTS | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2182234 (IND RESEARCH LTD CENTRE [IL]) [X] 1,3,6,8,9,12-14,27,29 * examples 1-6; claims 1-8 * [Y] 31-35; | [XY]US3846570 (VETTER W, et al) [X] 1-4,11-14,27,29,36-38 * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 36; examples I-VII; figures 1-3 * [Y] 31-35; | [XY]GB2103919 (RICH PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,12,14,23,27-30 * example 6; claims 1-17 * [Y] 31-35,39,40; | [XY]US4547376 (SILVER MYRON E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-14,16,21-27,29,36-40 * column 3, lines 1-46; examples 1-2; figure 1; claims 1-13 * [Y] 31-35; | [X]EP0834261 (OCEAN SPRAY CRANBERRIES INC [US]) [X] 36 * page 6, line 40 - page 7, line 57; figure 3 *; | [XY]US6468573 (HERRICK MARLIN G [US], et al) [X] 36,37 * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 33; figures 1 and 2 * [Y] 39,40; | [X]WO2005002349 (MOTTS INC [US], et al) [X] 36* page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 20; figures 1 and 2 * |