EP1935084 - BATTERY CHARGING DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A BATTERY CHARGING DEVICE AND POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fronius International GmbH Vorchdorfer Straße 40 4643 Pettenbach / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Fronius International GmbH Vorchdorfer Strasse 40 4643 Pettenbach / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARTELSMAIR, Bernhard Pettenbach 312 A-4643 Pettenbach / AT | 02 /
MÖSENEDER, Josef Bergham 28 A-4654 Bad Wimsbach / AT | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06774772.5 | 08.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006AT00374 | Priority number, date | AT20050001655 | 11.10.2005 Original published format: AT 16552005 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007041729 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1935084 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02J7/02 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H01F30/12 (EP,US);
H02J7/02 (EP,US);
H02M3/28 (EP);
H01F27/40 (EP);
H02J2207/20 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | BATTERIELADEGERÄT, VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES SOLCHEN BATTERIELADEGERÄTS UND STROMWANDLER | [2008/26] | English: | BATTERY CHARGING DEVICE, METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH A BATTERY CHARGING DEVICE AND POWER CONVERTER | [2008/26] | French: | APPAREIL CHARGEUR DE BATTERIE, PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CET APPAREIL CHARGEUR DE BATTERIE ET TRANSFORMATEUR DE COURANT | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/47] | 14.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0367984 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 6-14 * pages 2-5 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19704604 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,15-19,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US6531862 (STANLEY GERALD R [US]) [X] 20,21* figures 1-3,5,6a *; | [Y]WO03088460 (ASCOM ENERGY SYSTEMS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-4,15-19,5-14 * pages 8,10,14 * * pages 19,20 * * figures 4a,4b * |