EP1913351 - TIME-TEMPERATURE INDICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE AUSTRALIAN NATIONAL UNIVERSITY Acton, ACT 0200 / AU | [2009/11] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states CRC SMARTPRINT PTY LTD Building 75, Room G114, Monash University Victoria 3800 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAIG, Vincent 4 Druitt Place Macquarie, ACT 2614 / AU | 02 /
SENDEN, Timothy John 27 Bandjalong Crescent Aranda, ACT 2614 / AU | 03 /
KUGGE, CHRISTIAN 3/46 Williams Street Frankston, VIC 3199 / AU | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06774783.2 | 27.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006AU01058 | Priority number, date | AU20050904010 | 27.07.2005 Original published format: AU 2005904010 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012132 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913351 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01K11/06, G01K1/06, G01K3/10, G01N31/22 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G01K11/06 (EP,US);
G01K1/02 (EP,US);
G01K3/04 (EP,US);
G01N31/229 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZEIT-TEMPERATURINDIKATOREN | [2008/17] | English: | TIME-TEMPERATURE INDICATORS | [2008/17] | French: | INDICATEURS TEMPS/TEMPÉRATURE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004163367 (COGAR WILLIAM K [US], et al); | [X]US5057434 (PRUSIK THADDEUS [US], et al); | [X]US6564742 (PERNER FREDERICK A [US], et al); | [A]US4753188 (SCHMOEGNER JOHN C [US]); | [A]WO2004077001 (METSO CORP [FI], et al); | [A]EP1149880 (NICHU GIKEN KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]US5779364 (CANNELONGO JOSEPH F [US], et al); | [A]US4428321 (ARENS ROBERT P [US]) |