EP1984272 - REMOVAL OF SEDIMENT FROM A CONTAINER HOLDING LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alkemade, Patrick William Intellepro, Level 7, 102 Adelaide Street Brisbane, QLD 4000 / AU | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALKEMADE, Patrick, William 90 Hoyt Street Lindow, Victoria 3865 / AU | 02 /
SHELLCOT, Brett 378 King Street Caboolture, Queensland 4510 / AU | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
ALKEMADE, Patrick, William Intellepro Level 7 102 Adelaide Street Brisbane Queensland 4000 / AU | ||
02 /
SHELLCOT, Brett Intellepro, Level 7 102 Adelaide Street Brisbane, Queensland 4000 / AU | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weber-Quitzau, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hermann, Bettina Celia, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06774920.0 | 04.09.2006 | [2008/44] | WO2006AU01291 | Priority number, date | AU20060900364 | 25.01.2006 Original published format: AU 2006900364 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007085040 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984272 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/20, B65D51/24, B67B1/08, C12G1/08, C12L11/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
C12G1/08 (EP,US);
B01D21/2483 (EP,US);
C12L11/00 (EP,US);
B01D2221/02 (EP,US);
B01D2221/06 (EP,US);
Y10T137/794 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | 25.08.2008 | BA | 25.08.2008 | HR | 25.08.2008 | MK | 25.08.2008 | RS | 25.08.2008 | Title | German: | ENTFERNEN VON SEDIMENT VON EINEM FLÜSSIGKEIT ENTHALTENDEN BEHÄLTER | [2008/44] | English: | REMOVAL OF SEDIMENT FROM A CONTAINER HOLDING LIQUID | [2008/44] | French: | ELIMINATION DE SEDIMENT A PARTIR D UN RECIPIENT CONTENANT UN LIQUIDE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0156354 (GOTIT LTD [IL], et al); | [X]US6260474 (YAHAV SHIMON [IL]); | [X]US4932543 (MARTUS DON [US]); | [X]US4502604 (MARTUS DON [US]); | [X]US4687115 (BONGIOVANNI LINO [IT]); | [X]US3856169 (WILSON J, et al); | [X]DE3821512 (QUETSCH ANNEMARIE [DE]); | [X]FR2559741 (COSTA LUIGI [IT]); | [A]US5614236 (KLANG ALBERT [US]); | [A]US2139961 (PETER KLEID) |