EP1929843 - VARIABLE-EFFECT LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharos Innovations Inc. 258 Salem Avenue Toronto ON M6H 3C7 / CA | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUXTON, James 258 Salem Avenue Toronto, ON M6H 3C7 / CA | [2014/44] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
RUXTON, James 258 Salem Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6H 3C7 / CA | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06775119.8 | 16.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006CA01344 | Priority number, date | CN2005192007 | 16.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510092007 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019693 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929843 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929843 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, G05D25/02 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
H05B45/44 (EP,US);
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
H05B47/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM MIT VARIABLEM EFFEKT | [2008/24] | English: | VARIABLE-EFFECT LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2008/24] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE A EFFET VARIABLE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 18.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15159208.6 / EP2914069 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 18.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2006 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | IT | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | IE | 16.08.2015 | LU | 16.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 16.08.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 16.08.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0124146 (EVERBRITE INC [US]) [Y] 1-11,15-19 * the whole document *; | [XY]CA2371167 (PHAROS INNOVATIONS INC [CA]) [X] 12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11,15-19; | [Y]WO03069223 (POLARIS POOL SYS INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10353460 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 1-19* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5066896 (BERTENSHAW DAVID R [GB], et al); | [A]GB2244358 (GOMOLUCH MARK STEPHEN); | [A]US5420482 (PHARES LOUIS A [CA]); | [X]CA2371167 (PHAROS INNOVATIONS INC [CA]) |