EP1913284 - PACKAGING MACHINE COMPRISING A CHAIN FOR TRANSPORT OF MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/17] | CHAIN FOR A MACHINE DRIVE, TRANSPORT OF MATERIAL IN A MACHINE OR THE LIKE, AND PACKAGING MACHINE COMPRISING ONE SUCH CHAIN | ||
[2016/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTIVAC Sepp Haggenmüller SE & Co. KG Bahnhofstrasse 4 87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Multivac Sepp Haggenmüller GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstr. 4 87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUZIC, Ivo Karl-Diem-Weg 26 87437 Kempten / DE | 02 /
EHRMANN, Elmar Nordweg 9 87730 Bad Grönenbach / DE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2009/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Roth, Klaus Patentanwalt Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06775819.3 | 07.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006DE01382 | Priority number, date | DE20051038356 | 11.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038356 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019823 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913284 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913284 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/02, F16G13/18, B65B41/14, B65G17/12, B65H5/02, B65G17/32 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
F16G1/28 (EP,US);
B65B41/14 (EP,US);
B65G17/12 (EP,US);
B65G17/323 (EP,US);
B65H5/028 (EP,US);
F16G13/02 (EP,US);
F16G13/06 (EP,US);
F16G13/18 (EP,US);
F16H7/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | F16G13/02, F16G13/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE MIT EINER KETTE FÜR EINEN MATERIALTRANSPORT | [2016/34] | English: | PACKAGING MACHINE COMPRISING A CHAIN FOR TRANSPORT OF MATERIAL | [2016/34] | French: | MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE EQUIPEE D'UNE CHAINE POUR LE TRANSPORT DE MATIERE | [2016/34] |
Former [2008/17] | KETTE FÜR EINEN MASCHINENANTRIEB, EINEN MATERIALTRANSPORT IN EINER MASCHINE ODER DERGLEICHEN UND VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE MIT EINER SOLCHEN KETTE | ||
Former [2008/17] | CHAIN FOR A MACHINE DRIVE, TRANSPORT OF MATERIAL IN A MACHINE OR THE LIKE, AND PACKAGING MACHINE COMPRISING ONE SUCH CHAIN | ||
Former [2008/17] | CHAINE CONÇUE POUR UN ENTRAINEMENT DE MACHINE, TRANSPORT DE MATIERE AU SEIN D'UNE MACHINE OU ANALOGUE, ET MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE EQUIPEE DE LADITE CHAINE | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2006 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | AT | 07.08.2017 | IE | 07.08.2017 | LU | 07.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.08.2006 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
AT | 07.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
AT | 07.08.2017 | ||
IE | 07.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 07.08.2017 | ||
LU | 07.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 18.01.2017 | |
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10351125 (CONTITECH ANTRIEBSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * paragraph [0027] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,5 *; | [X]US2627756 (BENDALL WILFRID H) [X] 1-5,8 * column 3, line 14 - line 16 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 44 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US4147069 (DERNER WILLIAM J) [X] 1,2,7,8 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 6 - line 18 *; | [X]US3282121 (WEHNER WILLIAM C) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 40 - line 59 * * figure 3 *; | [X]JP2004028200 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract *; | [X]FR1215244 (M.RENE CHAVAND) [X] 1,5 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]FR2218509 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * claims 1-3 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]CA2135185 (PROPRIETARY TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 2,4 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE3315419 (MULTIVAC HAGGENMUELLER KG [DE]) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4826065 (NATTERER JOHANN [DE], et al) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1503107 (IGUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 3-5 * | by applicant | US4826065 | JP2004028200 | DE10351125 | FR1215244 | US3282121 | US2627756 | US4147069 |