EP1934006 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRESSING A MOLDED PART BY MEANS OF A TRANSVERSAL MALE MOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dorst Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Mittenwalder Strasse 61 82431 Kochel am See / DE | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENZEL, Roland Am Wieden 9B 82431 Kochel am See / DE | 02 /
SILBERMANN, Michael, Thomas Ludmühlstr. 20 83673 Bichl / DE | 03 /
ZIPPEL, Karl Kerschgarten 4 82436 Eglfing / DE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Schulze, Mark Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Schulze, Mark Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06775852.4 | 14.08.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006DE01423 | Priority number, date | DE20051038915 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038915 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007019832 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1934006 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1934006 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/03, B30B15/02, B30B11/02 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
B30B11/027 (EP,US);
B22F3/03 (EP,US);
B30B1/26 (EP,US);
B30B1/261 (EP,US);
B30B11/007 (EP,US);
B30B7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRESSEN EINES FORMTEILS MIT EINEM QUERSTEMPEL | [2008/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRESSING A MOLDED PART BY MEANS OF A TRANSVERSAL MALE MOLD | [2008/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION D'UN ARTICLE MOULE AU MOYEN D'UN POINÇON TRANSVERSAL | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 25.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.10.2009 | CZ | 07.10.2009 | DK | 07.10.2009 | EE | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | IE | 07.10.2009 | LT | 07.10.2009 | LV | 07.10.2009 | NL | 07.10.2009 | PL | 07.10.2009 | RO | 07.10.2009 | SE | 07.10.2009 | SI | 07.10.2009 | SK | 07.10.2009 | TR | 07.10.2009 | BG | 07.01.2010 | GR | 08.01.2010 | ES | 18.01.2010 | IS | 07.02.2010 | PT | 08.02.2010 | HU | 08.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 07.10.2009 | |
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
HU | 08.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 07.10.2009 | |
CZ | 07.10.2009 | ||
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 07.10.2009 | |
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
GR | 08.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CZ | 07.10.2009 | |
DK | 07.10.2009 | ||
EE | 07.10.2009 | ||
FI | 07.10.2009 | ||
IE | 07.10.2009 | ||
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
RO | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
SK | 07.10.2009 | ||
BG | 07.01.2010 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
NL | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
LT | 07.10.2009 | ||
LV | 07.10.2009 | ||
PL | 07.10.2009 | ||
SE | 07.10.2009 | ||
SI | 07.10.2009 | ||
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
IS | 07.02.2010 | ||
PT | 08.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | SI | 07.10.2009 | |
ES | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/16] | SI | 07.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0788698 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19508952 (SCHWAEBISCHE HUETTENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]JPH11300496 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20115860U (SCHNEIDER HARALD [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |