EP1758791 - DEVICE FOR SUB-DIVIDING TUBULAR PACKAGING INTO PACKAGING UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tipper Tie technopack GmbH Wilhelm-Bergner-Strasse 9a 21509 Glinde / DE | [2015/49] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Tipper Tie technopack GmbH Otto-Hahn-Strasse 5 21509 Glinde / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Tipper Tie technopack GmbH Otto-Hahn-Strasse 5 D-21509 Glinde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUSE, Holger Von-Suppé-Str. 20a 22145 Hamburg / DE | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776080.1 | 26.06.2006 | [2007/10] | WO2006EP06152 | Priority number, date | DE20052010152U | 27.06.2005 Original published format: DE 202005010152 U | [2007/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000301 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758791 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758791 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/12, B65B51/04, A22C11/00 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A22C11/105 (EP,US);
B65B51/04 (EP,US);
B65B9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM UNTERTEILEN EINES VERPACKUNGSSCHLAUCHS IN VERPACKUNGSEINHEITEN | [2007/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUB-DIVIDING TUBULAR PACKAGING INTO PACKAGING UNITS | [2007/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR SUBDIVISER UN BOYAU DE CONDITIONNEMENT EN UNITES DE CONDITIONNEMENT | [2007/16] |
Former [2007/10] | DISPOSITIF POUR SUBDIVISER UN BOYAU DE CONDITIONNEMENT EN UNITES DE CONDITIONNEMENT | ||
Former [2007/10] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM UNTERTEILEN EINES VERPACKUNGSSCHLAUCHS IN VERPACKUNGSEINHEITEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 02.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2008
26.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Niedeckerstraße 1 65795 Hattersheim / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/03] |
Former [2014/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2008
26.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Niedeckerstraße 1 65795 Hattersheim / DE Opponent's representative Fritsche, Rainer, et al, et al Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Arnulfstrasse 27 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2008
26.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Niedeckerstraße 1 65795 Hattersheim / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, et al, et al Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2008
26.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Westerbachstrasse 45 60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | 24.06.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.10.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.08.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.08.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 22.08.2019 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2019/48] | Appeal following opposition | 21.10.2015 | Appeal received No. T1973/15 | 22.12.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: closure of the opposition procedure | 09.10.2015 | Appeal received No. T1973/15 | 09.10.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: closure of the opposition procedure |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | DK | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | GB | 15.08.2007 | IE | 15.08.2007 | LT | 15.08.2007 | LV | 15.08.2007 | NL | 15.08.2007 | PL | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SI | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | TR | 15.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | GR | 16.11.2007 | IS | 15.12.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | LU | 26.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | AT | 26.06.2009 | HU | 27.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | IT | 26.06.2017 | ES | 27.06.2017 | DE | 03.01.2018 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/28] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 26.06.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/20] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
TR | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
LU | 26.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
AT | 26.06.2009 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 27.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CY | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 15.08.2007 | |
DK | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
GB | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
GR | 16.11.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
LV | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
PL | 15.08.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
LT | 15.08.2007 | ||
NL | 15.08.2007 | ||
IS | 15.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 15.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]NL7104959 (DIPL.ING. HERBERT NIEDECKER TE FALKENSTEIN, BONDSREPUBLIEK DUITSLAND) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE2550042 (NIEDECKER HERBERT) [A] * figures 4,5 *; | [A]GB2100110 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4403946 (HAGEDORN KG TECHNOPACK EWALD [DE]) [A] * column 3, line 1 - line 15; figure 1 * |