EP1910698 - SLEEVE/ROLLER FREEWHEEL WITH A SOLID OUTER RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTMANN, Frieder Schweinbach 12 A 96178 Pommersfelden / DE | 02 /
DÖRRIE, Swen Von-hauk-str. 4 A 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 03 /
WIRTH, Werner Linden 31 91466 Gerhardshofen / DE | 04 /
PLOETZ, Volker Wolfsberger Str. 38 A 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2008/16] | Application number, filing date | 06776175.9 | 11.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP06743 | Priority number, date | DE20051034038 | 21.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005034038 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009629 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910698 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910698 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/067, F16D1/08 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
F16D41/067 (EP,KR,US);
F16D1/08 (KR);
F16D1/0852 (EP,US);
F16D2250/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/36] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÜLSEN-/ ROLLENFREILAUF MIT MASSIVEM AUSSENRING | [2008/16] | English: | SLEEVE/ROLLER FREEWHEEL WITH A SOLID OUTER RING | [2008/16] | French: | ROUE LIBRE A ROULEAUX/DOUILLE POURVUE D'UNE BAGUE EXTERIEURE MASSIVE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 22.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE1750493 (TORRINGTON CO) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 8 - page 3, line 15 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 10-16; | [Y]EP0549824 (INA BEARING CO [US]) [Y] 10-16 * column 4, line 7 - line 24 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3339687 (COWLES JOHN H) [X] 1-4,6,8,9 * column 2, line 1 - line 21 * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]DE1777169 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * page 1, line 8 - line 14 * * page 3, line 1 - line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]DE19532923 (EXEDY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 21 - line 30 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,6,15 | by applicant | DE1750493 | US3339687 | DE1777169 | EP0549824 | DE19532923 |