EP1910302 - CARBONYL SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLINE COMPOUNDS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE AS CB1 RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCHMANN, Helmut, H. Carrer dels Avellaners, 11 E-08960-Sant Just Desvern / ES | 02 /
TORRENS JOVER, Antonio C/Racó, 8, 2 2a E-08221 Terrasa / ES | 03 /
MAS PRIO, Jose C/ Cal Princep, 39 08191 Rubi / ES | 04 /
QUINTANA RUIZ, Jordi Ramón Carrer de les Aigues, 12 E-08391 Tiana / ES | 05 /
DORDAL ZUERAS, Alberto C/Maladeta, 26 3 3a E-08016 Barcelona / ES | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Peters, Hajo, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | Peters, Hajo, et al Albihns Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Peters, Hajo, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Peters, Hajo, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776259.1 | 15.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP06961 | Priority number, date | EP20050384018 | 15.07.2005 Original published format: EP 05384018 | EP20060008579 | 26.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06008579 | EP20060008580 | 26.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06008580 | EP20060008581 | 26.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06008581 | EP20060008612 | 26.04.2006 Original published format: EP 06008612 | US20050705433P | 05.08.2005 Original published format: US 705433 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009687 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910302 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/06, C07D403/12, C07D401/06, C07D403/06, C07D495/04, A61K31/4155, A61P3/04 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
C07D231/06 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP);
C07D403/06 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D495/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | CARBONYLSUBSTITUIERTE PYRAZOLINVERBINDUNGEN, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS MODULATOREN DES CB1-REZEPTORS | [2008/16] | English: | CARBONYL SUBSTITUTED PYRAZOLINE COMPOUNDS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE AS CB1 RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2008/16] | French: | COMPOSES DE PYRAZOLINE A SUBSTITUTION CARBONYLE, PREPARATION DE CEUX-CI ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI COMME MODULATEURS DES RECEPTEURS CB1 | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2005077911 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES], et al) [PX] 1-14,16-30 * claims 1,9,23-34 *; | [PX]WO2005074920 (SOLVAY PHARM BV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-14,16-30 * claims 1,8-12; compounds 1-4 *; | [A] - LANGE J H M ET AL, "SYNTHESIS, BIOLOGICAL PROPERTIES, AND MOLECULAR MODELING INVESTIGATIONS OF NOVEL 3,4-DIARYLPYRAZOLINES AS POTENT AND SELECTIVE CB1 CANNABINOID RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (2004), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 627 - 643, XP001188902 [A] 1-30 * compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm031019q | [A] - THOMAS ET AL, "Synthesis of long-chain amide analogs of the cannabinoid CB1 receptor antagonist N-(piperidinyl)-5-(4-chlorophenyl)-1-(2,4-dichlorophenyl)- 4-methyl-1H-pyrazole-3-carboxamide (SR141716) with unique binding selectivities and pharmacological activities", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, GB, (20050701), vol. 13, no. 18, ISSN 0968-0896, pages 5463 - 5474, XP005021048 [A] 1-30 * compounds 5-27 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2005.06.005 |