EP1907247 - SUPPORT JACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOST-Werke Deutschland GmbH Siemensstraße 2 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [2017/39] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states JOST-Werke GmbH Siemensstrasse 2 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Jost-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Siemensstr. 2 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Gerald Adenauer Strasse 4 63179 Obertshausen / DE | 02 /
SEIDEL, Günter Pestalozzistrasse 13 64560 Riedstadt / DE | 03 /
ALGÜERA, José Bessenbacher Weg 85 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2017/46] |
Former [2013/21] | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Söhnleinstraße 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776311.0 | 20.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006EP07145 | Priority number, date | DE20051034555 | 23.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005034555 | [2008/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007012426 | Date: | 01.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907247 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907247 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60S9/04, B65D90/12, B66F3/02 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
B60S9/08 (EP,US);
B65D90/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZWINDE | [2008/15] | English: | SUPPORT JACK | [2008/15] | French: | BEQUILLE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2006 | CY | 15.11.2017 | CZ | 15.11.2017 | DK | 15.11.2017 | EE | 15.11.2017 | FI | 15.11.2017 | IT | 15.11.2017 | LT | 15.11.2017 | LV | 15.11.2017 | MC | 15.11.2017 | NL | 15.11.2017 | PT | 15.11.2017 | RO | 15.11.2017 | SE | 15.11.2017 | SI | 15.11.2017 | SK | 15.11.2017 | TR | 15.11.2017 | BG | 15.02.2018 | GR | 16.02.2018 | IS | 15.03.2018 | AT | 20.07.2018 | IE | 20.07.2018 | LU | 20.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.07.2006 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 20.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 20.07.2006 | |
CY | 15.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
PT | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 20.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
TR | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 20.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
AT | 20.07.2018 | ||
IE | 20.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 20.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 20.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
IE | 20.07.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
LU | 20.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
MC | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SI | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
IT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
RO | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 15.11.2017 | |
CZ | 15.11.2017 | ||
DK | 15.11.2017 | ||
EE | 15.11.2017 | ||
FI | 15.11.2017 | ||
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
SK | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
LV | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
BG | 15.02.2018 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | ||
SE | 15.11.2017 | ||
GR | 16.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 15.11.2017 | |
LT | 15.11.2017 | ||
NL | 15.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8101691 (DAYTON WALTHER CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-12 * page 3, line 32 - page 8, line 14; figure - *; | [A]US2815962 (MCKAY HARRY M) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |