EP1915875 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPROVED DISPLAY STANDARD CONFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barco NV President Kennedypark 35 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMPE, Tom Meersstraat 34 B-9000 Gent / BE | 02 /
DORVAL, Etienne Vanden Elschenstraat 30 B-1061 Sint-Pieters-Leeuw / BE | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co NV Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Bird, Ariane, et al Bird Goën & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 06776418.3 | 26.07.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006EP07361 | Priority number, date | US20050703877P | 01.08.2005 Original published format: US 703877 P | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007014681 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915875 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915875 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/04 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
G09G3/2092 (EP,US);
G09G3/006 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0693 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERTEN EINHALTUNG VON ANZEIGESTANDARDS | [2008/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR IMPROVED DISPLAY STANDARD CONFORMANCE | [2008/18] | French: | METHODE ET DISPOSITIF POUR AMELIORER LA CONFORMITE PAR RAPPORT A UNE NORME D'AFFICHAGE | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2006 | AT | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | IE | 26.07.2013 | LU | 26.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.07.2006 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.07.2013 | ||
LU | 26.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 26.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1548573 (BARCO NV [BE]) [X] 1-37 * paragraphs [0010] , [0019] - [0022] *; | [A]EP0204112 (IBM [US]); | [A]WO0180211 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) | Examination | US2003231193 | by applicant | EP1548573 | US2003231193 | - BAOXIN LI, "Adaptive Display Color Correction based on real-time Viewing Angle Estimation", SID 2004 | - S. L. WRIGHT, "Low-cost Method to Improve Viewing-Angle Characteristics of Twisted-Nematic Mode Liquid-Crystal Displays", SID 2002 |