EP1913239 - CONNECTION ELEMENT FOR THE SECURE FIXING OF A LEVER-TYPE CAM FOLLOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÖCK, Stephan Waldstrasse 26 91362 Pretzfeld / DE | 02 /
ENGELHARDT, Helmut Schumannstrasse 30 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2008/17] | Application number, filing date | 06776457.1 | 27.07.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP07444 | Priority number, date | DE20051036918 | 05.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036918 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017132 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913239 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913239 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/18 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
F01L1/185 (EP,US);
F01L2001/187 (EP,US);
F01L2305/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49295 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20882 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, HU, IT, PL [2008/35] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT ZUR VERLIERSICHEREN HALTERUNG EINES HEBELARTIGEN NOCKENFOLGERS | [2008/17] | English: | CONNECTION ELEMENT FOR THE SECURE FIXING OF A LEVER-TYPE CAM FOLLOWER | [2008/17] | French: | ELEMENT DE CONNEXION DESTINE A LA FIXATION IMPERDABLE D'UN SUIVEUR DE CAME DE TYPE LEVIER | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 06.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2006 | IT | 19.02.2014 | PL | 19.02.2014 | AT | 27.07.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/51] | IT | 19.02.2014 | |
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
AT | 27.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | IT | 19.02.2014 | |
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | PL | 19.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US6047675 (KUNZ TIMOTHY WILTON [US]) [DA] 1-5 * column 1, lines 5-10 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 15 * * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 23 * * figures 9,10 *; | [A]DE19640919 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, lines 6-12 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 25 * * figure - *; | [A]WO2004038185 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 13-19 * * page 3, lines 8-17 * * page 5, lines 12-17 * * page 6, lines 4-15 * * figure - *; | [A]US2002043233 (SPEIL WALTER [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * figure - *; | [A]DE29707987U (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 5 * * figure - * |