EP1910784 - POTENTIAL SEPARATION FOR FILL LEVEL RADAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstrasse 1-5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2020/12] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstrasse 1-5 77709 Wolfach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIESSBAUM, Karl Hauptstrasse 32 77796 Mühlenbach / DE | 02 /
FEHRENBACH, Josef Schlattstrasse 1 77716 Haslach / DE | 03 /
SCHULTHEISS, Daniel Reichenbacherstrasse 37 78132 Hornberg / DE | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/12] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 D-80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776566.9 | 02.08.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP07652 | Priority number, date | DE20051036715 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036715 | US20050705597P | 04.08.2005 Original published format: US 705597 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017170 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910784 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910784 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2020/12] |
Former [2008/35] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POTENTIALTRENNER FÜR RADAR-FÜLLSTANDSMESSGERÄT | [2019/45] | English: | POTENTIAL SEPARATION FOR FILL LEVEL RADAR | [2008/16] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ISOLEMENT POUR RADAR DE DÉTECTION DE NIVEAU | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/16] | POTENTIALTRENNUNG FÜR EINEN FÜLLSTANDSRADAR | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 05.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001047685 (LUBBERS WILHELM [DE]) [X] 1-11,15-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003151560 (KIENZLE KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-11,13-27 * paragraphs [0040] - [0059]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2002067229 (LUBBERS WILHELM [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,11,15-19,21,24,25 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5872494 (PALAN DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,15-21,23-27 * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 61; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19617963 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]) [A] 13,14 * column 2, lines 2-25 * | Examination | WO2005038414 | WO2006110329 |