EP1920453 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MULTILAYER ELECTROSTATIC LENS ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states UNIVERSITÄT KARLSRUHE Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERTHSEN, Dagmar Sophienstrasse 16 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
PEREZ-WILLARD, Fabian Dorfstrasse 14 73433 Aalen / DE | 03 /
SCHULTHEISS, Katrin Lachnerstrasse 8 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
GERTHSEN, Dagmar Sophienstrasse 16 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02 /
PEREZ-WILLARD, Fabian Enzstrasse 15 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
03 /
SCHULTHEISS, Katrin Lachnerstrasse 8 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | Mergel, Volker Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Mergel, Volker Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776643.6 | 05.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006EP07780 | Priority number, date | DE20051040267 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005040267 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007022862 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1920453 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/26, H01J37/12 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
H01J37/26 (EP,US);
H01J37/12 (EP,US);
H01J37/263 (EP,US);
H01J2237/226 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2614 (EP,US);
H01J2237/31749 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ELEKTROSTATISCHEN LINSENANORDNUNG | [2008/20] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MULTILAYER ELECTROSTATIC LENS ARRAY | [2008/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ENSEMBLE LENTILLES ELECTROSTATIQUE A PLUSIEURS COUCHES | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 24.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO03068399 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [DX] 2,19 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 1 - page 12, paragraph 3 * * figure - * [Y] 1,3-18,20-37; | [DXY]EP0782170 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [DX] 2 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 15 * * page 3, line 31 - line 57 * * page 4, line 53 - line 59 * * page 6, line 27 - line 38 * * page 7, line 3 - line 35 * * figure - * [Y] 1,3-18,20-37; | [A]EP1329936 (LEO ELEKTRONENMIKROSKOPIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 2-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0008] , [0009] , [0012] , [0013] , [0022] - [0025] - [0028] , [0029] * * figure - *; | [A]US2004222382 (HARTLEY FRANK T [US]) [A] 1,20-37 * abstract *; | [PX] - K. SCHLTHEISS ET ALL, "Fabrication of a Boersch plate for phase contrast imaging in a transmission electron source", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (20060310), vol. 77, no. 033701, pages 1 - 4, XP002418322 [PX] 1-37 * the whole document * | [PX] - E. MAJOROVITS ET ALL, "Optimizing phase contrast in transmission electron microscopy with an electrostatic (Boersch) phase plate", ULTRAMICROSCOPY, (2007), vol. 107, pages 213 - 226, XP002418323 [PX] 1-37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultramic.2006.07.006 |