EP1913024 - METHOD FOR THE PURIFICATION OF ALPHA-1 PROTEINASE INHIBITOR (a1PI) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/17] | METHOD FOR THE PURIFCATION OF ALPHA-1 PROTEINASE INHIBITOR (a1PI) | ||
[2009/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Hertistrasse 2 8304 Wallisellen / CH | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTHIESSEN, Peter Vorgartenstrasse 129-143/1/5 A-1020 Vienna / AT | 02 /
BRACHTL, Gerald Hellwagstrasse 4-8/6/22 A-1200 Vienna / AT | 03 /
TURECEK, Peter Weidling Hauptstrasse 59g A-3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | 04 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-Peter Poetzleinsdorfer Strasse 50/9/2 1180 Vienna / AT | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
MATTHIESSEN, Peter Vorgartenstrasse 129-143/1/5 A-1020 Vienna / AT | ||
02 /
BRACHTL, Gerald Hellwagstrasse 4-8/6/22 A-1200 Vienna / AT | |||
03 /
TURECEK, Peter Weidling Hauptstrasse 59g A-3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | |||
04 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-Peter Poetzleinsdorfer Strasse 50/9/2 1180 Wienna / AT | |||
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
MATTHIESSEN, Peter Vorgartenstrasse 129-143/1/5 A-1020 Vienna / AT | ||
02 /
BRACHTL, Gerald Hellwagstrasse 4-8/6/22 A-1200 Vienna / AT | |||
03 /
TURECEK, Peter Weidling Hauptstrasse 59g A-3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | |||
04 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-Peter Schindlergasse 32 A-1180 Wienna / AT | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776720.2 | 09.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP07899 | Priority number, date | US20050202349 | 11.08.2005 Original published format: US 202349 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017277 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913024 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913024 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/81 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C07K14/8125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG DES ALPHA-1-PROTEINASE-INHIBITORS (A1PI) | [2008/17] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PURIFICATION OF ALPHA-1 PROTEINASE INHIBITOR (a1PI) | [2009/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE L'ALPHA-1 PROTEINASE (A1PI) | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/17] | METHOD FOR THE PURIFCATION OF ALPHA-1 PROTEINASE INHIBITOR (a1PI) | ||
Former [2008/17] | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE L'ALPHA-1 PROTÉINASE (A1PI) | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.05.2009 | CY | 13.05.2009 | CZ | 13.05.2009 | DK | 13.05.2009 | EE | 13.05.2009 | FI | 13.05.2009 | LT | 13.05.2009 | LV | 13.05.2009 | NL | 13.05.2009 | PL | 13.05.2009 | RO | 13.05.2009 | SI | 13.05.2009 | SK | 13.05.2009 | TR | 13.05.2009 | IE | 09.08.2009 | LU | 09.08.2009 | BG | 13.08.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | GR | 14.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | IS | 13.09.2009 | PT | 13.09.2009 | HU | 14.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 09.08.2009 | ||
LU | 09.08.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 09.08.2009 | ||
LU | 09.08.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/18] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 09.08.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 09.08.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/42] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 09.08.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | BE | 13.05.2009 | |
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 13.05.2009 | |
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
NL | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9535306 (ALPHA THERAPEUTIC CORP [US]) [AD] 1-24* the whole document *; | [DA]WO9800154 (ALPHA THERAPEUTIC CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [XD] - M H COAN ET AL., "Preparation and properties of alpha-1-proteinase inhibitor concentrate from human plasma", VOX SANGUINIS., CH S. KARGER AG, BASEL., (1985), vol. 48, pages 333 - 342, XP002940191 [XD] 1-24 * the whole document * |