EP1919985 - LIGHT-SCATTERING SHEET HAVING HIGH LIGHT TRANSMISSION AND IMPROVED ANTISTATIC PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÜDIGER, Claus Boleystr. 13 47829 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
PUDLEINER, Heinz Bethelstr. 39 47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
MEYER, Klaus Kamillenstr. 40 41539 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
RÖHNER, Jürgen Brambachstr. 86 51069 Köln / DE | 05 /
GRÜTER-REETZ, Tanja Traarer Str. 309 47829 Krefeld / DE | 06 /
KANEKO, Fumika 3-32-8 Koenji, Minami Suginami-Ku, Tokyo 166-0003 / JP | [2008/20] | Application number, filing date | 06776780.6 | 11.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006EP07961 | Priority number, date | DE20051040313 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005040313 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007022886 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1919985 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L69/00, B32B27/36, C08L33/06, C08K5/42, C08L71/02 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08K5/42 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/06 (KR);
C08L69/00 (EP,US);
G02B5/0242 (EP,US);
G02B5/0278 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/22 (EP,US);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | LICHTSTREUENDE PLATTE MIT HOHER LICHTTRANSMISSION UND VERBESSERTER ANTISTATIK | [2008/20] | English: | LIGHT-SCATTERING SHEET HAVING HIGH LIGHT TRANSMISSION AND IMPROVED ANTISTATIC PROPERTIES | [2008/20] | French: | FEUILLE A DIFFUSION LUMINEUSE PRESENTANT UNE HAUTE TRANSMISSION LUMINEUSE ET DES PROPRIETES ANTISTATIQUES AMELIOREES | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US2004228141 (HAY GRANT [US], et al) [DY] 1-4,10 * paragraphs [0038] , [0056] - [0060]; claims 1,7,53 *; | [Y]JP2001323148 ; | [DA]EP0634445 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000226507 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 37, Database accession no. 2002-333120, XP002452157 & JP2001323148 A 20011120 (TAKEMOTO OIL & FAT CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,10 * abstract * | Examination | JPH115241 |