EP1913659 - ELECTRIC PLUG CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kostal Kontakt Systeme GmbH Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATTER, Brantley 2478 Woodvalle Trail Brighton, Michigan 48114 / US | 02 /
EPE, Peter Am Radenberg 54 57368 Lennestadt / DE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Kerkmann, Detlef Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG An der Bellmerei 10 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Kerkmann, Detlef Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG An der Bellmerei, 10 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776788.9 | 11.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP07969 | Priority number, date | DE20051038167 | 12.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038167 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007020020 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913659 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913659 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/625, H01R13/639 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
H01R13/625 (EP,US);
H01R13/639 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER | [2008/17] | English: | ELECTRIC PLUG CONNECTOR | [2008/17] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE ENFICHABLE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 09.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | IE | 25.03.2009 | LT | 25.03.2009 | LV | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | PL | 25.03.2009 | RO | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | IS | 25.07.2009 | AT | 11.08.2009 | LU | 11.08.2009 | BE | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | PT | 31.08.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
AT | 11.08.2009 | ||
LU | 11.08.2009 | ||
BE | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
AT | 11.08.2009 | ||
LU | 11.08.2009 | ||
BE | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
AT | 11.08.2009 | ||
BE | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/31] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 25.03.2009 | |
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3248154 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19830671 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-8* the whole document *; | [AD]DE19830672 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * |