EP1915546 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR USE IN VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A STARTING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Turbo GmbH & Co. KG Alexanderstrasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEMENT, Werner Taubenweg 6 89520 Heidenheim / DE | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776830.9 | 14.08.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006EP08019 | Priority number, date | DE20051039000 | 16.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005039000 | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007020037 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915546 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915546 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D33/16 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
F16D33/16 (EP);
F16D2500/10487 (EP);
F16D2500/30406 (EP);
F16D2500/30415 (EP);
F16D2500/70426 (EP);
F16D2500/7044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/47] |
Former [2008/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR DEN EINSATZ IN FAHRZEUGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES ANFAHRVORGANGES IN FAHRZEUGEN | [2008/18] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR USE IN VEHICLES AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A STARTING PROCESS | [2008/18] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE DANS DES VEHICULES ET PROCEDE POUR OPTIMISER LE PROCESSUS DE DEMARRAGE DANS DES VEHICULES | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 13.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1963720 (HAROLD SINCLAIR) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 26 - line 49 * * page 1, line 70 - line 87 *; | [A]DE3231368 (VOITH TURBO KG) [A] 1,6 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1188601 (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [A] 1,6,8 * claim - * |