EP1922370 - COATING MATERIALS CONTAINING SILANE-MODIFIED NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖSCH, Norbert Troppauer Strasse 2a 86368 Gersthofen / DE | 02 /
KRENDLINGER, Ernst Ulrichstrasse 63 86316 Friedberg / DE | 03 /
HEINZE, Anja Wisperweg 12 65239 Hochheim/Main / DE | 04 /
ZEISBERGER, Karl Rübezahlstrasse 7a 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
RÖSCH, Norbert Troppauer Strasse 2a 86368 Gersthofen / DE | ||
02 /
KRENDLINGER, Ernst Ulrichstrasse 63 86316 Friedberg / DE | |||
03 /
HEINZE, Anja Am Heissanger 23b 86405 Meitingen/Erlingen / DE | |||
04 /
ZEISBERGER, Karl Rübezahlstrasse 7a 86368 Gersthofen / DE | Representative(s) | Paczkowski, Marcus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Paczkowski, Marcus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Paczkowski, Marcus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776871.3 | 16.08.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006EP08065 | Priority number, date | DE20051039436 | 18.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005039436 | [2008/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007020062 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1922370 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09C3/00, C09C3/12, C09C1/40, C09C3/04, C09D7/12 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
C09C3/12 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/407 (EP,US);
C09C3/006 (EP,US);
C09C3/041 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSMASSEN ENTHALTEND MIT SILANEN MODIFIZIERTE NANOPARTIKEL | [2008/21] | English: | COATING MATERIALS CONTAINING SILANE-MODIFIED NANOPARTICLES | [2008/21] | French: | MATIERES D'ENDUCTION CONTENANT DES NANOPARTICULES MODIFIEES PAR DES SILANES | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0164796 (FERON ALUMINIUM [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 6; claims 1-4 * * page 3, line 19 - line 29 *; | [X]WO03055939 (UCB SA [BE], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 32 - line 33 * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 11 * * example 3; claims 1,6,13 *; | [X]WO2004069400 (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 19 * * page 6, line 1 - line 31 * * page 11, line 9 - page 12, line 27 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 5 * * page 15, line 20 - line 33 * * page 17, line 16 - line 19; examples 1-5 ** page 19, line 4 - line 20 * |