EP1927230 - ENABLING SIMULTANEOUS USE OF HOME NETWORK AND FOREIGN NETWORK BY A MULTIHOMED MOBILE NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Jens c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
WENIGER, Kilian c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
HAKENBERG, Rolf c/o Panasonic R & D Center Germany GmbH Monzastrasse 4c 63225 Langen / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776927.3 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006EP08128 | Priority number, date | EP20050020354 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05020354 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039016 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927230 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927230 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
H04W8/04 (EP,US);
H04W60/005 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W80/02 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERMÖGLICHUNG DER GLEICHZEITIGEN BENUTZUNG EINES HEIMATNETZES UND FREMDNETZES DURCH EINEN MEHRFACHHEIMAT-MOBILKNOTEN | [2008/23] | English: | ENABLING SIMULTANEOUS USE OF HOME NETWORK AND FOREIGN NETWORK BY A MULTIHOMED MOBILE NODE | [2008/23] | French: | AUTORISATION D'UTILISATION SIMULTANEE DE RESEAU DOMESTIQUE ET DE RESEAU ETRANGER PAR UN NOEUD MOBILE A RESIDENCES MULTIPLES | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10153482.4 / EP2180661 | EP10179059.0 / EP2271160 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2010 | BE | 10.03.2010 | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | IT | 10.03.2010 | LT | 10.03.2010 | LV | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | PL | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | TR | 10.03.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | ES | 21.06.2010 | IS | 10.07.2010 | PT | 12.07.2010 | IE | 17.08.2010 | LU | 17.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 11.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
IE | 17.08.2010 | ||
LU | 17.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
IE | 17.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
IE | 17.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
BE | 10.03.2010 | ||
CY | 10.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 10.03.2010 | |
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003018810 (KARAGIANNIS GEORGIOS [NL], et al) [Y] 25-27 * paragraphs [0198] , [0199] *; | [Y]EP1432198 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 2,4,6-8,14,15,37 * paragraphs [0013] , [0020] , [0021] , [0044] , [0045]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2004059926 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-52 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2004111750 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,20-23,28-31,40-46,48-52 * abstract * [Y] 2,4-19,24-27,32-39,47; | [Y]US2005128975 (KOBAYASHI HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [Y] 5,9-13,16-19,24,32,34-36,38,39,47 * paragraphs [0008] , [0070] - [0078] - [0012] - [0122] - [0206] - [0304]; figure 3 *; | [PA]US2006050628 (NG CHAN-WAH [SG], et al) [PA] 1-52* the whole document *; | [PXY]EP1635515 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,3,20-23,28-31,40-46,48-52 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024] - [0033] - [0035] - [0063] - [0075]; figure 2 * [PY] 2,4-19,24-27,32-39,47 |