EP1922334 - TUMOR-ASSOCIATED PEPTIDES BINDING TO HUMAN LEUKOCYTE ANTIGEN (HLA) CLASS I OR II MOLECULES AND RELATED ANTI-CANCER VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2011/01] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Str. 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Harpreet Bei den Pferdeställen 9 72072 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
EMMERICH, Niels Schönbuchstrasse 34 72074 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
WALTER, Steffen Blumenstrasse 1 72411 Dusslingen / DE | 04 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | [2009/24] |
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
SINGH, Harpreet Französische Allee 6 72072 Tübingen / DE | ||
02 /
EMMERICH, Niels Schönbuchstrasse 34 72074 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
WALTER, Steffen Blumenstrasse 1 72411 Dusslingen / DE | |||
04 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | |||
Former [2008/21] | 01 /
SINGH, Harpreet Ferdinand-Christian-Baur-Str. 12 72076 Tübingen / DE | ||
02 /
EMMERICH, Niels Neckarhalde 39 72070 Tübingen / DE | |||
03 /
WALTER, Steffen Blumenstrasse 1 72411 Dusslingen / DE | |||
04 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06777167.5 | 05.09.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006EP08641 | Priority number, date | EP20050019255 | 05.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05019255 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007028573 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1922334 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922334 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N15/00, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, C12P21/00 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
A61K39/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Extension states | AL | 20.02.2008 | BA | 20.02.2008 | HR | 20.02.2008 | MK | 20.02.2008 | RS | 20.02.2008 | Title | German: | AN HUMANE LEUKOZYTENANTIGEN-(HLA-)KLASSE-I- ODER II-MOLEKÜLE BINDENDE TUMORASSOZIIERTE PEPTIDE UND DAMIT IM ZUSAMMENHANG STEHENDER IMPFSTOFF GEGEN KREBS | [2008/21] | English: | TUMOR-ASSOCIATED PEPTIDES BINDING TO HUMAN LEUKOCYTE ANTIGEN (HLA) CLASS I OR II MOLECULES AND RELATED ANTI-CANCER VACCINE | [2008/21] | French: | PEPTIDES ASSOCIES AUX TUMEURS SE LIANT AUX MOLECULES D'ANTIGENE DE LEUCOCYTE HUMAIN (HLA) DE CLASSE I OU II ET VACCIN CONTRE LE CANCER ASSOCIE | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 26.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0006723 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [Y] 6,11,14-22,24,25,33,35,36 * page 5, line 17 - page 22, line 33 *; | [Y]US6096313 (JAEGER ELKE [DE], et al) [Y] 21 * page 13, column 1, line 29 - line 49 *; | [X]US2004171543 (DUBLANCHET ANNE-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 32; sequence 13 *; | [XY] - HEID H W ET AL, "Adipocyte differentiation-related protein is secreted into milk as a constituent of milk lipid globule membrane", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, PORTLAND PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19961215), vol. 320, no. PART 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 1025 - 1030, XP002060680 [X] 1-5 * page 1027; figure 2 * * page 1027; figure 2 * [Y] 6,14-17,19,20,26-29 | [X] - BARNETT J ET AL., "Production, purification and characterization of human matrilysin (PUMP) from recombinant chinese hamster ovary cells", PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1994), vol. 5, pages 27 - 36, XP002352893 [X] 1-5 * page 34; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/prep.1994.1004 | [X] - WELCH AR ET AL., "Purification of human matrilysin produced in Escherichia coli and characterization using a new optimized fluorogenic peptide substrate", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (1995), vol. 324, no. 1, pages 59 - 64, XP002352894 [X] 7-10,12,13,23 * page 60, column 1, line 13 - line 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abbi.1995.9929 | [Y] - BROSSART P ET AL, "Identification of HLA-A2-restricted T-cell epitopes derived from the MUC1 tumor antigen for broadly applicable vaccine therapies", BLOOD, W.B.SAUNDERS COMPANY, ORLANDO, FL, US, (19990615), vol. 93, no. 12, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4309 - 4317, XP002147432 [Y] 18 * page 4310, column 1, line 53 - line 61 * | [DY] - WEINSCHENK T ET AL, "Integrated functional genomics approach for the design of patient-individual antitumor vaccines", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20021015), vol. 62, no. 20, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5818 - 5827, XP002266492 [DY] 11,22,24,25,33,35,36 * page 5820, column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 34 * | [DY] - SUMI TOSHIYUKI ET AL, "Expression of matrix metalloproteinases 7 and 2 in human renal cell carcinoma", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, NATIONAL HELLENIC RESEARCH FOUNDATION, ATHENS, GR, (200305), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 567 - 570, XP002352032 [DY] 11,22,24,25,33,35,36 * the whole document * | [DY] - SCHMIDT SM ET AL, "Induction of adipophilin-specific cytotoxic T lymphocytes using a novel HLA-A2 binding peptide that mediates tumor cell lysis", CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 64, pages 1164 - 1170, XP002352895 [DY] 26-29 * page 1165, column 1, line 61 - page 1167, column 2, line 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-03-2538 | [Y] - BROSSART P ET AL, "Virus-mediated delivery of antigenic peptides into dendritic cells as a means to induce CTL", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (19970401), vol. 7, no. 158, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3270 - 3276, XP002075947 [Y] 28 * page 3272, column 2, line 5 - page 3273, column 1, line 1; figure 4 * |