EP1896694 - A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALTSON, John David 22 Denefield, Skellingthorp Lincoln, Lincolnshire LN6 5AX / GB | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06777419.0 | 22.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006EP63471 | Priority number, date | GB20050013144 | 28.06.2005 Original published format: GB 0513144 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000409 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1896694 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/29] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTOR | [2008/11] | English: | A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2008/11] | French: | TURBINE A GAZ | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 29.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2065334 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-32 * page 5, line 2 - line 32 * * page 6, line 9 - line 16 * * page 6, line 27 - line 34 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE2847012 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1-32 * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph L * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US6227798 (DEMERS DANIEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,17,22-24,27-32 * column 3, line 26 - line 38 * * column 3, line 52 - line 65 * * column 4, line 2 - line 18 * * figure - *; | [A]US2002122716 (BEACOCK ROBERT JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * page 3, paragraph 28 ** figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP1249575 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,12-14,17,21-32 * column 5, paragraph 24 * * column 6, paragraphs 26,27 * * figure 3 * | Examination | US3975901 | US8240980 | by applicant | DE2065334 | US3975901 | DE2847012 | US6227798 | US2002122716 | EP1249575 |