EP1924933 - MAINTAINING AN AGGREGATE INCLUDING ACTIVE FILES IN A STORAGE POOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Howard, Newton 10538 South Peregrine Ridge Court Vail, Arizona 85641 / US | 02 /
CANNON, David, Maxwell 9791 East Kleindale Road Tucson, Arizona 85749 / US | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Ling, Christopher John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 06777449.7 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006EP63511 | Priority number, date | US20050206488 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: US 206488 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007020124 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1924933 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
G06F16/1873 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US);
Y10S707/99943 (US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99954 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERHALTUNG EINES AGGREGATS MIT AKTIVEN DATEIEN IN EINEM SPEICHERUNGS-POOL | [2008/22] | English: | MAINTAINING AN AGGREGATE INCLUDING ACTIVE FILES IN A STORAGE POOL | [2008/22] | French: | MAINTIEN D'UN AGREGAT COMPRENANT DES FICHIERS ACTIFS DANS UN GROUPE D'UNITES DE STOCKAGE | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5983239 (CANNON DAVID MAXWELL [US]) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 29 *; | [A]US6330572 (SITKA LARRY [US]) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 7, line 49 *; | [A]US2004199521 (ANGLIN MATTHEW JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-33 * abstract ** paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] *; | [DX]US2005165722 (CANNON DAVID M [US], et al) [DX] 1-33 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0084] * |